Rouser v. Augusta Collection Agency, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joanne Rouser
Defendant: Augusta Collection Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00221
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joanne Rouser (Hormozdi, Shireen)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Set Aside #8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Joanne Rouser. Responses due by 9/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hormozdi, Shireen)
August 16, 2019 Set Deadlines: Case Settlement Deadline 10/15/2019. (ni) Modified file date on 8/19/2019 (ni).
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Joanne Rouser (Hormozdi, Shireen)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Joanne Rouser. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hormozdi, Shireen)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Should Defendant seek an extension of time to answer, it should do so by way of a motion that conforms with the Rules of Civil Procedure and local rules, and be filed by an attorney who is admitted to practice before this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 08/13/2019. (ni)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Joanne Rouser. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hormozdi, Shireen). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joanne Rouser. Augusta Collection Agency, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Hormozdi, Shireen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Augusta Collection Agency, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
July 12, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joanne Rouser (Hormozdi, Shireen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Shireen Hormozdi on behalf of Joanne Rouser (Hormozdi, Shireen)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Augusta Collection Agency, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4093467), filed by Joanne Rouser. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(Hormozdi, Shireen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rouser v. Augusta Collection Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Augusta Collection Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Rouser
Represented By: Shireen Hormozdi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?