Gusmer v. Revis et al
Plaintiff: Frederick E. Gusmer, Jr
Defendant: Jody Luihn, Flat Rock Cider Group, LLC, Flat Rock Cider Works, LLC, Jeff Schenk, James Sparks, 4 J's Produce and Apples, LLC, Revis Grounds Maintence, Inc., James M. Revis and Revis Grounds Maintenance, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00289
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Motions #12 and #13 Motions for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants James Revis; James Sparks; Revis Ground Maintenance, Inc.; Flat Rock Cider Works, LLC; Jeff Schenk; 4 Js Produce and Apples, LLC; and Flat Rock Cider Group, LLC d/b/a Flat Rock Cider Company answer due 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/3/2019. (ni)
December 3, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frederick E. Gusmer, Jr. 4 J's Produce and Apples, LLC waiver sent on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Anderson, Philip)
December 3, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by 4 J's Produce and Apples, LLC, Flat Rock Cider Group, LLC, Jeff Schenk. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for Extension of Time)(Medford, Michael). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Flat Rock Cider Works, LLC, James M. Revis, Revis Grounds Maintenance, Inc., James Sparks. (Jones, W.). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frederick E. Gusmer, Jr. Jody Luihn waiver sent on 11/11/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Anderson, Philip)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frederick E. Gusmer, Jr. Flat Rock Cider Group, LLC waiver sent on 10/25/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Anderson, Philip)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frederick E. Gusmer, Jr. Jeff Schenk waiver sent on 10/25/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Anderson, Philip)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Scott Jones on behalf of Flat Rock Cider Works, LLC, James M. Revis, Revis Grounds Maintenance, Inc., James Sparks (Jones, W.)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Medford on behalf of Flat Rock Cider Group, LLC, Jeff Schenk (Medford, Michael)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frederick E. Gusmer, Jr. Revis Grounds Maintenance, Inc. waiver sent on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Anderson, Philip)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frederick E. Gusmer, Jr. Flat Rock Cider Works, LLC waiver sent on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Anderson, Philip)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frederick E. Gusmer, Jr. James Sparks waiver sent on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Anderson, Philip)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Frederick E. Gusmer, Jr. James M. Revis waiver sent on 10/16/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Anderson, Philip)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
October 11, 2019 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4218513), filed by Frederick E. Gusmer, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Anderson, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gusmer v. Revis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jody Luihn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flat Rock Cider Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael T. Medford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flat Rock Cider Works, LLC
Represented By: W. Scott Jones
Represented By: W. Bradford Searson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Schenk
Represented By: Michael T. Medford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Sparks
Represented By: W. Scott Jones
Represented By: W. Bradford Searson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4 J's Produce and Apples, LLC
Represented By: Michael T. Medford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revis Grounds Maintence, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Revis
Represented By: W. Scott Jones
Represented By: W. Bradford Searson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revis Grounds Maintenance, Inc.
Represented By: W. Scott Jones
Represented By: W. Bradford Searson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick E. Gusmer, Jr
Represented By: Philip Scott Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?