Stephenson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Stephenson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00317
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Social Security Administration (SSA) served on 11/13/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (reh)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Andrew Saul, US Attorney, and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285s)(ni)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (Sealed - Participants) granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk is directed to issue summons and provide to USMS for service on defendant. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/7/2019. (ni)
November 5, 2019 Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elizabeth Stephenson. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(Stepp, Christopher)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, filed by Elizabeth Stephenson.(Stepp, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephenson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Stephenson
Represented By: Christopher S. Stepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?