Andrews v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Petitioner: Glen Andrews
Respondent: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 1:2019cv00338
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying Pltf's #6 Motion requesting the filing of the "Oath and Affirmation" of Judge Max O. Cogburn, and Pltf's #7 Motion for New Trial "Court Lacks Jurisdiction in Judge's Order Document 4 Judgment in case Document 5". Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 1/30/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT by Glen Andrews. (kby)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 Miscellaneous Filing: COPY of #4 Order, #5 Clerk's Judgment by Glen Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kby)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for New Trial "Court Lacks Jurisdiction in Judge's Order Document 4 Judgment in case Document 5" by Glen Andrews. (kby) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2020: #1 Duplicate Filing) (kby).
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION requesting the filing of the "Oath and Afformation" of Judge Max O. Cogburn by Glen Andrews. (kby)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 1/03/2020. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing Pltf's document, stylized as a #1 MOTION/APPLICATION to Confirm or Vacate Arbitration Award. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 1/03/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glen Andrews. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage served on 12/12/2019. (maf)
December 12, 2019 Filing Fee Received: $ 400, receipt number CHD057403 (ctb)
December 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf no longer assigned to case due to conflict. (thh)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Wells Fargo Home Mortgage. Summons provided to Petitioner at counter. (reh) Modified text on 12/9/2019 (reh).
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Confirm Arbitration Award (Filing fee $ 400), filed by Glen Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Bill in Equity for Enforcement of Contract, #2 3/22/19 Conditional Acceptance, #3 Arbitration Documents, #4 Proposed Order)(reh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Glen Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?