Jahagirdar v. The Computer Haus NC, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shailesh Jahagirdar
Defendant: Troy Curran and The Computer Haus NC, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00033
Filed: February 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Sierra B. Robinson by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Karissa Martin by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE AND TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On March 9, 2020, the parties were notified of their obligation to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference and file a Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference ("CIAC") by March 30, 2020. A review of the docket indicates that the parties have not filed the CIAC. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file the CIAC by April 10, 2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 4/3/2020. (maf)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Damian Rivera by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Haley Chamberlain by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Jordan Blais by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Cara Campbell by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Logan Barrett by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Kimberly Bartolon by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Christopher R. Earle by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Spencer Rutland by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Aaron M. Nash by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Logan Sewell by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Kamri Norris by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Allen D. Allen by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Deborah Crouson by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Conditionally Certify a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice by Troy Curran, The Computer Haus NC, Inc.. Replies due by 4/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fletcher, Murphy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/31/2020 with correct .pdf). NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Troy Curran, The Computer Haus NC, Inc..(Fletcher, Murphy)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Murphy Horne Fletcher on behalf of All Defendants (Fletcher, Murphy)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Jade M. Thomas by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines re Response to #7 Amended Complaint: Troy Curran answer due 3/30/2020; The Computer Haus NC, Inc. answer due 3/30/2020. (maf)
March 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff - Hunter Rooks by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
March 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Consent to Become Party Plaintiff - Ashley Cochrane by Shailesh Jahagirdar (Gessner, L.)
March 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 Motion to Conditionally Certify a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice by Shailesh Jahagirdar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Jahagirdar Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Collective Action Lawsuit, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Join)(Gessner, L.) Modified docket text on 3/16/2020. (maf)
March 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Conditionally Certify a Collective Action and Facilitate Notice Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by Shailesh Jahagirdar. Responses due by 3/30/2020 (Gessner, L.) Modified docket text on 3/16/2020. (maf)
March 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Exhibit by Shailesh Jahagirdar. Exhibit to #7 Amended Complaint Exhibit A - Jahagirdar Consent (Gessner, L.)
March 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against all defendants filed by Shailesh Jahagirdar.(Gessner, L.) Modified docket text on 3/16/2020. (maf)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 3/30/2020. (maf)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Computer Haus NC, Inc. (Rockoff, Sabrina)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Troy Curran, The Computer Haus NC, Inc..(Rockoff, Sabrina)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Shailesh Jahagirdar. The Computer Haus NC, Inc. served on 2/22/2020, answer due 3/16/2020. (Gessner, L.)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Shailesh Jahagirdar. Troy Curran served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Gessner, L.)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to The Computer Haus NC, Inc., Troy Curran. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4374147), filed by Shailesh Jahagirdar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Litigation Hold Notice)(Gessner, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jahagirdar v. The Computer Haus NC, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shailesh Jahagirdar
Represented By: L. Michelle Gessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Curran
Represented By: Sabrina P. Rockoff
Represented By: Murphy Horne Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Computer Haus NC, Inc.
Represented By: Sabrina P. Rockoff
Represented By: Murphy Horne Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?