Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Winston Reed Investments L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Mark N. Pyatt, Daniel Randolph and Winston Reed Investments L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00042
Filed: February 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Unseal Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/19/2020. (reh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Unseal Case by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (khm) Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Mark N. Pyatt, Winston Reed Investments L.L.C. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ni)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SEALED ORDER granting Pltf's #1 Motion to Seal Case and #3 Motion for CM-ECF Access To Sealed Case, and directing Clerk to seal entire docket and file in this matter; this case is to be designated Sealed - Attorney and will be available electronically to court users and counsel of record for CFTC, including attorneys James A. Garcia and Richard A. Glaser; sealing ordered herein will be in effect temporarily; and directing Pltf file a notice and/or motion to unseal promptly following arrest of Mr. Pyatt. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/12/2020. (ejb) (Pltf's Attys James A. Garcia and Richard A. Glaser given access to this case.) Modified text on 2/12/2020 (ejb).
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION For CM-ECF Access To Sealed Case by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). (reh) Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief, Restitution, Civil Monetary Penalties, and Other Equitable Relief Under the Commodity Exchange Act against Winston Reed Investments L.L.C., Mark N. Pyatt, filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (reh)
February 10, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal Case by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Temporarily Seal). (reh) Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Winston Reed Investments L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark N. Pyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winston Reed Investments L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: James Anthony Garcia
Represented By: Richard A. Glaser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?