Brant v. NewRez LLC et al
Plaintiff: Melynda Leah Brant and Melynda Leah Bowling
Defendant: NewRez LLC and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00086
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Pocock, Donald)
May 18, 2020 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 6/8/2020. (maf)
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint in Notice of Removal, Counterclaim, by Melynda Leah Brant. (Hill, Camille)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NewRez LLC re; #7 Answer to Complaint in Notice of Removal, Counterclaim, (Hoffman, Ryan) Modified text on 5/3/2020 (ejb).
April 25, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, , COUNTERCLAIM against Melynda Leah Brant by NewRez LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Hoffman, Ryan)
April 15, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Pocock, Donald)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. NewRez LLC answer due 4/27/2020. Text of Order: ORDER: The Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Answer of NewRez, LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing ("Shellpoint") is GRANTED, and the deadline for Shellpoint to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including April 27, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 4/15/2020. (kkb)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Notice of Removal, by NewRez LLC. (Milam, George). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NewRez LLC (Milam, George)
April 8, 2020 Set Deadlines: Deadline for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and NewRez LLC to answer or respond to the Complaint is 4/15/2020. (maf)
April 8, 2020 Notice to Camille E. Hill: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Satisfy the Requirements for Admission to the Bar of this Court and Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Admission/ECF Registration Deadline: 4/15/2020. (Attorney Hill served via NEF at chill@brevardnclaw.com). (maf)
April 8, 2020 Case randomly assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Pocock, Donald)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald R. Pocock on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Pocock, Donald)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Transylvania County Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-96. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4452041), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Cover Sheet)(Pocock, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brant v. NewRez LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC
Represented By: George B. Milam
Represented By: Ryan P. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Donald R. Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melynda Leah Brant
Represented By: Camille E. Hill
Represented By: Camille Elyse Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melynda Leah Bowling
Represented By: Camille Elyse Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?