Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC v. Return to Excellence, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC
Defendant: Samuel Ned Carver, Return to Excellence, Inc., SN Carver, LLC, Mountain Preservation, LLC, Waynesville Overlook, LLC and Return to Excellence, Inc. doing business as The Waynesville Inn Golf Resort & Spa
Case Number: 1:2020cv00137
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants. Text of Order: ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED by twenty (20) days, through and including August 20, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 7/31/2020. (kkb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint, by Samuel Ned Carver, Mountain Preservation, LLC, Return to Excellence, Inc., SN Carver, LLC, Waynesville Overlook, LLC. (Roberson, Matthew). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
July 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Roberson on behalf of All Defendants (Roberson, Matthew)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (khm)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance P. Martin on behalf of Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC (Martin, Lance)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Norman J. Leonard, II on behalf of Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC (Leonard, Norman)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC (Leonard, Norman)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4518714), filed by Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Note 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Note 1 Security Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Note 1 Guarantees, #4 Exhibit 4 - Note 1 Demand Letters, #5 Exhibit 5 - Note 2, #6 Exhibit 6 - Note 2 Security Agreement, #7 Exhibit 7 - Note 2 Guarantee, #8 Exhibit 8 - Note 2 Demand Letters, #9 Exhibit 9 - CC Agreement)(Leonard, Norman)
June 4, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (khm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC v. Return to Excellence, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Ned Carver
Represented By: Matthew S. Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Return to Excellence, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SN Carver, LLC
Represented By: Matthew S. Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain Preservation, LLC
Represented By: Matthew S. Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waynesville Overlook, LLC
Represented By: Matthew S. Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Return to Excellence, Inc. doing business as The Waynesville Inn Golf Resort & Spa
Represented By: Matthew S. Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Newtek Small Business Finance, LLC
Represented By: Lance P. Martin
Represented By: Norman J. Leonard, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?