Ledford v. Bryson City Police Department et al
Plaintiff: April Ledford
Defendant: Bryson City Police Department, Chris Dudley, Curtis Cochran, Town of Bryson City, Swain County Sheriff's Department, Andrew Bryant, Hilda Arch, Beth McDonald, Swain County Jail, Tom Sutton and Daniel Scott Pearson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00168
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Defendant's #7 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/27/2020. (kby)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Defendant's #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by April Ledford. Responses due by 9/4/2020 (kby). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Andrew Bryant, Bryson City Police Department, Curtis Cochran, Chris Dudley, Swain County Sheriff's Department, Town of Bryson City, Tom Sutton, Swain County Jail, Beth McDonald, Hilda Arch, Daniel Scott Pearson, filed by April Ledford.(kby)
August 19, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Swain County Sheriff's Department served on 7/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(brl)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by US Marshal as to Andrew Bryant. (Not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward) (tmg)
August 14, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by US Marshal. Bryson City Police Department served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; Curtis Cochran served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; Chris Dudley served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020; Swain County Sheriff's Department served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020; Town of Bryson City served on 7/21/2020, answer due 8/11/2020. (tmg)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Andrew Bryant, Curtis Cochran, Swain County Sheriff's Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Perrin, Sean)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Andrew Bryant, Curtis Cochran, Swain County Sheriff's Department. Responses due by 8/24/2020 (Perrin, Sean). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against April Ledford by Chris Dudley, Town of Bryson City, Bryson City Police Department.(MacLatchie, Scott)
July 24, 2020 Filing Fee Received: $ 200.00, receipt number CHD060830 (js)
July 20, 2020 Filing Fee Received: $ 200.00 filing fee received over the counter in Asheville Clerk's office and forwarded to Charlotte for processing. (kby)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Andrew Bryant, Bryson City Police Department, Curtis Cochran, Chris Dudley, Swain County Sheriff's Department, Town of Bryson City. (Attachments: #1 USM-285s)(ni)
July 15, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's $200.00 Filing Fee due by 7/31/2020. (ni)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (Sealed - Participants) granting in part #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to pay a $200 filing fee to Clerk of Court by 7/31/2020. Plaintiff shall prepare summons and provide to Clerk, who, upon receipt of summons, shall issue and provide to USMS for service upon defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 7/15/2020. (ni)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Request to Receive Electronic Notification by April Ledford. (kby) Modified file date on 7/9/2020 (kby).
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by April Ledford. (ni). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Bryant, Bryson City Police Department, Curtis Cochran, Chris Dudley, Swain County Sheriff's Department, Town of Bryson City filed by April Ledford. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (ni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledford v. Bryson City Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryson City Police Department
Represented By: Scott Douglas MacLatchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Dudley
Represented By: Scott Douglas MacLatchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Cochran
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Bryson City
Represented By: Scott Douglas MacLatchie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swain County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bryant
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda Arch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swain County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Scott Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Ledford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?