Barkley et al v. 4520 Corp., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rita W. Barkley and Randy W. Barkley
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Covil Corporation, GREAT BARRIER INSULATION CO., INC., Grinnell LLC, Viking Pump, Inc., BW/IP, Inc., Fluor Constructors International, Crane Co., The Gorman-Rupp Company, 4520 CORP., INC., YUBA HEAT TRANSFER, LLC., Fisher Controls International, LLC., Bonitz, Inc., Elliott Company, Aurora Pump Company, A.W. Chesterton Company, General Electric Company, Velan Valve Corp., D & B INSULATIONS, INC., SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC., SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Daniel International Corporation, Riley Power, Inc.,, IMO INDUSTRIES INC., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Flowserve Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, ITT Corporation, ABLEST INC., Carboline Company, Crosby Valve, LLC, Flowserve US Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, FMC Corporation, WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC., ViacomCBS Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Sequoia Ventures, Inc., THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. formerly known as Aqua-Chem, Inc. doing business as Cleaver-Brooks Division, Zurn Industries, LLC, ITT Fluid Products Corp., William Powell Company, Aqua-Chem, Inc., Bell and Gossett Company, DB Riley, Inc., Riley Stoker Corporation, Grinnell LLC doing business as Grinnell Corporation, ITT Marlow, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, ITT Industries, Inc., Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc., Duriron Company, Inc., Fluor Corporation and Hoffman Speciality Mfg. Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00220
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 154 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of D&B Insulations, Inc. by Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley (Paul, Kevin)
October 7, 2020 Filing 153 NOTICE of Death of Plaintiff, Rita Barkley by Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley (Paul, Kevin)
October 7, 2020 Notice to Jonathan Andrew George: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. by 10/14/2020. (Attorney George served with this Notice via NEF at jgeorge@dobslegal.com) (maf)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #148 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Jonathan Andrew George is hereby granted pro hac vice admission to the bar of this Court and is added to the docket for Randy W. Barkley and Rita W. Barkley. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/7/2020. (maf)
October 6, 2020 Filing 151 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC. (Holden, John)
October 6, 2020 Filing 150 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC..(Holden, John)
October 6, 2020 Filing 149 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bechtel Corporation (Groseclose, Mathew)
October 2, 2020 Filing 148 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan Andrew George Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4697356. by Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Admitting Jonathan Andrew George) (Graham, William) Modified docket text on 10/5/2020. (maf)
October 2, 2020 Filing 147 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ablest Inc. (Hampton, Christopher)
October 2, 2020 Filing 146 ANSWER to Complaint by Bechtel Corporation and Sequoia Ventures, Inc.(Groseclose, Mathew) Modified on 10/5/2020 to add Sequoia as a filer. NEF Regenerated. (maf)
October 1, 2020 Magistrate Judge David Keesler no longer assigned to case. (khm)
September 29, 2020 Filing 145 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bonitz, Inc. (Dedman, James)
September 29, 2020 Filing 144 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bonitz, Inc..(Dedman, James)
September 28, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Lee Davis, Jr on behalf of A.W. Chesterton Company (Davis, H.)
September 28, 2020 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Lee Davis, Jr on behalf of 4520 Corp., Inc. (Davis, H.)
September 28, 2020 Filing 141 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by 4520 Corp., Inc..(Walters, Jason)
September 28, 2020 Filing 140 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 4520 Corp., Inc. (Walters, Jason)
September 28, 2020 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Larry Walters on behalf of 4520 Corp., Inc. (Walters, Jason)
September 28, 2020 Filing 138 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by A.W. Chesterton Company.(Walters, Jason)
September 28, 2020 Filing 137 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.W. Chesterton Company (Walters, Jason)
September 28, 2020 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Larry Walters on behalf of A.W. Chesterton Company (Walters, Jason)
September 28, 2020 Notice to Ryan J. Lindley: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov by 10/5/2020. (Attorney Lindley served with this Notice via NEF at rlindley@vonbriesen.com) (maf)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #133 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Rhyan J. Lindley admitted to practice on this action on behalf of Crosby Valve, LLC and Fisher Controls International, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/28/2020. (Attorney Lindley served with Order via NEF at rlindley@vonbriesen.com) (maf)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #132 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Philip C. Reid admitted to represent Defendants Fisher Controls International LLC and Crosby Valve, LLC in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge David C. Keesler on 9/28/2020. (maf)
September 28, 2020 Filing 133 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Rhyan J. Lindley Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4688591. by Crosby Valve, LLC, Fisher Controls International, LLC.. (O'Neill, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 28, 2020 Filing 132 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Philip C. Reid Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4688570. by Crosby Valve, LLC, Fisher Controls International, LLC.. (O'Neill, Mary). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 26, 2020 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Dedman, IV on behalf of Bonitz, Inc. (Dedman, James)
September 25, 2020 Filing 130 Amended Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Williamson, Stephen)
September 24, 2020 Filing 129 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velan Valve Corp. (Peck, Timothy)
September 24, 2020 Filing 128 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Velan Valve Corp..(Peck, Timothy)
September 24, 2020 Filing 127 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong International, Inc. (Peck, Timothy)
September 24, 2020 Filing 126 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Armstrong International, Inc..(Peck, Timothy)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting #122 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Moffatt G. McDonald is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., The Gorman-Rupp Company, and Union Carbide Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/23/2020. (maf)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #121 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Scott E. Frick is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., The Gorman-Rupp Company, and Union Carbide Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/23/2020. (maf)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #120 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. W. David Conner is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., The Gorman-Rupp Company, and Union Carbide Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/23/2020. (maf)
September 23, 2020 Filing 122 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Moffatt G. McDonald Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4682249. by Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., The Gorman-Rupp Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (Major, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 23, 2020 Filing 121 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott E Frick Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4682221. by Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., The Gorman-Rupp Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (Major, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 23, 2020 Filing 120 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to W. David Conner Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4682189. by Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., The Gorman-Rupp Company, Union Carbide Corporation. (Major, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 22, 2020 Notice to Amy H. Geddes: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/29/2020. (kby)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #117 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and Affidavit added Amy Harmon Geddes for FMC Corporation. Amy H. Geddes is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant FMC Corporation, on behalf of its former Peerless Pump Business. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/22/2020. (kby)
September 21, 2020 Notice to Cheryl D. Shoun: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov by 9/28/2020. (Attorney Shoun received this notice via NEF @ cshoun@nexsenpruet.com) (maf)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #116 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Cheryl D Shoun is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Ablest, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/21/2020. (maf)
September 21, 2020 Filing 117 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Amy H. Geddes Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4679389. by FMC Corporation. (Santos, Peter). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 21, 2020 Filing 116 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Cheryl D. Shoun Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4679272. by Ablest Inc.. (Hampton, Christopher). Motions referred to David Keesler.
September 21, 2020 Filing 115 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viking Pump, Inc. (Drayton, Amy)
September 21, 2020 Filing 114 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and ANSWER to All CROSS-CLAIMS with Jury Demand by Viking Pump, Inc.(Drayton, Amy) Modified docket text on 9/23/2020. (maf)
September 18, 2020 Filing 113 Notice of Appearance of Amy C. Drayton on behalf of Viking Pump, Inc. (Drayton, Amy) Modified docket text on 9/23/2020. (maf)
September 17, 2020 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer no longer assigned to the case due to conflict. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
September 16, 2020 Filing 112 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation (Santos, Peter)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #107 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. E. Elaine Shofner admitted to practice in this action on behalf of Riley Power, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/16/2020. (maf)
September 16, 2020 Filing 110 Summons Reissued Electronically as to Great Barrier Insulation Co., Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (tmg)
September 16, 2020 Filing 109 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Pump Company (O'Neill, Mary)
September 16, 2020 Filing 108 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Aurora Pump Company.(O'Neill, Mary)
September 16, 2020 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to E. Elaine Shofner Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4670967. by Riley Power, Inc.,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Rubel, Douglas). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 16, 2020 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of Zurn Industries, LLC (Starr, William)
September 16, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of ITT Corporation (Starr, William)
September 16, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of Grinnell LLC (Starr, William)
September 16, 2020 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Incorporated (Starr, William)
September 16, 2020 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of Elliott Company (Starr, William)
September 16, 2020 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of Carboline Company (Starr, William)
September 16, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Starr, William)
September 16, 2020 Filing 99 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses by William Powell Company.(Oakley, David)
September 16, 2020 Filing 98 Corporate Disclosure Statement by William Powell Company (Oakley, David)
September 16, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Oakley on behalf of William Powell Company (Oakley, David)
September 16, 2020 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf no longer assigned to the case due to conflict. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
September 15, 2020 Filing 96 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve US Inc. (Fussell, Lauren)
September 15, 2020 Filing 95 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Flowserve US Inc..(Fussell, Lauren)
September 15, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E. Fussell on behalf of Flowserve US Inc. (Fussell, Lauren)
September 15, 2020 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BW/IP, Inc. (O'Neill, Mary)
September 15, 2020 Filing 92 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by BW/IP, Inc..(O'Neill, Mary)
September 15, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis J. Shipley on behalf of Covil Corporation (Shipley, Curtis)
September 15, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Scottie Forbes Lee on behalf of Covil Corporation (Lee, Scottie)
September 15, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie C. Packer on behalf of Covil Corporation (Packer, Leslie)
September 15, 2020 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Covil Corporation (Brathwaite, Ashley)
September 15, 2020 Filing 87 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Covil Corporation.(Brathwaite, Ashley)
September 15, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite on behalf of Covil Corporation (Brathwaite, Ashley)
September 15, 2020 Filing 85 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Insulation, Inc. (Williamson, Stephen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 84 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Southern Insulation, Inc..(Williamson, Stephen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 83 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. (Williamson, Stephen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 82 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cleaver-Brooks, Inc..(Williamson, Stephen)
September 15, 2020 Filing 81 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Riley Power, Inc.,.(Rubel, Douglas)
September 15, 2020 Filing 80 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Riley Power, Inc., (Rubel, Douglas)
September 15, 2020 Filing 79 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elliott Company (Tomlin, Tracy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 78 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Elliott Company.(Tomlin, Tracy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Andrew Rubel on behalf of Riley Power, Inc., (Rubel, Douglas)
September 15, 2020 Filing 76 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Tomlin, Tracy)
September 15, 2020 Filing 75 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.(Tomlin, Tracy) Modified text on 9/16/2020 (khm).
September 14, 2020 Filing 74 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurn Industries, LLC (Tomlin, Tracy)
September 14, 2020 Filing 73 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Zurn Industries, LLC.(Tomlin, Tracy)
September 14, 2020 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ITT Corporation (Tomlin, Tracy)
September 14, 2020 Filing 71 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ITT Corporation.(Tomlin, Tracy)
September 14, 2020 Filing 70 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grinnell LLC (Tomlin, Tracy)
September 14, 2020 Filing 69 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Grinnell LLC.(Tomlin, Tracy)
September 14, 2020 Filing 68 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps, Incorporated (Tomlin, Tracy)
September 14, 2020 Filing 67 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Goulds Pumps, Incorporated.(Tomlin, Tracy)
September 14, 2020 Filing 66 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carboline Company (Tomlin, Tracy)
September 14, 2020 Filing 65 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Carboline Company.(Tomlin, Tracy)
September 14, 2020 Filing 64 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2020 Filing 63 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ViacomCBS Inc. (Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2020 Filing 62 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Techman on behalf of Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Techman on behalf of ViacomCBS Inc. (Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Techman on behalf of General Electric Company (Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2020 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2020 Filing 57 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2020 Filing 56 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ViacomCBS Inc..(Techman, Jennifer)
September 14, 2020 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Flowserve Corporation (O'Neill, Mary)
September 14, 2020 Filing 54 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Flowserve Corporation.(O'Neill, Mary)
September 14, 2020 Filing 53 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FMC Corporation.(Santos, Peter)
September 14, 2020 Filing 52 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation (Major, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 51 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Union Carbide Corporation.(Major, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 50 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Gorman-Rupp Company (Major, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 49 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by The Gorman-Rupp Company.(Major, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc. (Major, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc..(Major, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Major, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Major, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation (Major, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation.(Major, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daniel International Corporation (Major, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Daniel International Corporation.(Major, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crosby Valve, LLC (O'Neill, Mary)
September 14, 2020 Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Crosby Valve, LLC.(O'Neill, Mary)
September 11, 2020 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc..(Borden, Peter)
September 11, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Sullivan on behalf of BW/IP, Inc. (Sullivan, Kimberly)
September 11, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of BW/IP, Inc. (O'Neill, Mary)
September 11, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (O'Neill, Mary)
September 11, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of Flowserve Corporation (O'Neill, Mary)
September 11, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of Crosby Valve, LLC (O'Neill, Mary)
September 11, 2020 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fisher Controls International, LLC. (O'Neill, Mary)
September 11, 2020 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Fisher Controls International, LLC..(O'Neill, Mary)
September 11, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of Fisher Controls International, LLC. (O'Neill, Mary)
September 11, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Nicholas Borden on behalf of SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. (Borden, Peter)
September 11, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crane Co..(Mather, Emily)
September 11, 2020 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co. (Mather, Emily)
September 11, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily K. Mather on behalf of Crane Co. (Mather, Emily)
September 11, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Marla Tun Reschly on behalf of Crane Co. (Reschly, Marla)
September 9, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Coltrain, Keith)
September 9, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and to Cross-Claims of any and all other Defendants and Third-Party Defendants by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Coltrain, Keith)
September 9, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Coltrain on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Coltrain, Keith)
September 8, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ablest Inc..(Hampton, Christopher)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC. answer due 10/16/2020. Text of Order: ORDER: Defendant Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendant Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including October 16, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 9/8/2020. (kkb)
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC. (Holden, John)
September 4, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. (Gordon, Frank)
September 4, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Motion for Extension of Time) (Holden, John). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
September 4, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John T. Holden on behalf of Yuba Heat Transfer, LLC. (Holden, John)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries Inc. (Bennett, Joshua)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by IMO Industries Inc..(Bennett, Joshua)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Sullivan on behalf of Flowserve Corporation (Sullivan, Kimberly)
September 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Sullivan on behalf of Fisher Controls International, LLC. (Sullivan, Kimberly)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Sullivan on behalf of Crosby Valve, LLC (Sullivan, Kimberly)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Sullivan on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Sullivan, Kimberly)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Gordon on behalf of SPX Cooling Technologies, Inc. (Gordon, Frank)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Hampton on behalf of Ablest Inc. (Hampton, Christopher)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kevin W. Paul admitted to practice pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/27/2020. (ni)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Charles W. Branham, III admitted to practice pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/27/2020. (ni)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin W. Paul Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4636600. by Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley. (Graham, William). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Charles (Trey) William Branham, III Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4636548. by Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Admitting Charles William Branham, III) (Graham, William). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. Modified attachment description on 8/25/2020 (ni).
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
August 18, 2020 Notice to Attorney Charles W. Branham, III: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 8/25/2020. (ejb)
August 18, 2020 Notice to Attorney Kevin W. Paul: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 8/25/2020. (ejb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles W. Branham, III on behalf of Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley (Branham, Charles)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Paul on behalf of Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley (Paul, Kevin)
August 13, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4619976), filed by Randy W. Barkley, Rita W. Barkley.(Graham, William) Modified text on 8/18/2020 (ejb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barkley et al v. 4520 Corp., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covil Corporation
Represented By: Curtis J. Shipley
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Scottie Forbes Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREAT BARRIER INSULATION CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Amy C. Drayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Sullivan
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Emily K. Mather
Represented By: Marla Tun Reschly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gorman-Rupp Company
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4520 CORP., INC.
Represented By: Jason Larry Walters
Represented By: H. Lee Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YUBA HEAT TRANSFER, LLC.
Represented By: John T. Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher Controls International, LLC.
Represented By: Kimberly Sullivan
Represented By: Philip C. Reid
Represented By: Rhyan J. Lindley
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonitz, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Company
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Kimberly Sullivan
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: Jason Larry Walters
Represented By: H. Lee Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D & B INSULATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC.
Represented By: Stephen B. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Peter N. Borden
Represented By: Frank J. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International, Inc.
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel International Corporation
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.,
Represented By: E. Elaine Shofner
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Rubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES INC.
Represented By: Joshua H. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly Sullivan
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel Corporation
Represented By: Mathew Ryan Groseclose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Daniel Services Corporation
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABLEST INC.
Represented By: Christopher R. Hampton
Represented By: Cheryl D. Shoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carboline Company
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Sullivan
Represented By: Philip C. Reid
Represented By: Rhyan J. Lindley
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Lauren E. Fussell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith E. Coltrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Amy H. Geddes
Represented By: Peter A. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIR VALVES & CONTROLS USA, INC.
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Ventures, Inc.
Represented By: Mathew Ryan Groseclose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. formerly known as Aqua-Chem, Inc. doing business as Cleaver-Brooks Division
Represented By: Stephen B. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Fluid Products Corp.
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Represented By: David B Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aqua-Chem, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen B. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell and Gossett Company
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Riley, Inc.
Represented By: E. Elaine Shofner
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Rubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Stoker Corporation
Represented By: E. Elaine Shofner
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Rubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC doing business as Grinnell Corporation
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Marlow
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Industries, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duriron Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Sullivan
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Corporation
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoffman Speciality Mfg. Corp.
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita W. Barkley
Represented By: William M. Graham
Represented By: Jonathan A. George
Represented By: Kevin W. Paul
Represented By: Charles W. Branham, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy W. Barkley
Represented By: William M. Graham
Represented By: Jonathan A. George
Represented By: Kevin W. Paul
Represented By: Charles W. Branham, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?