King-El v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Timothy D. King-El
Defendant: FNU Wilson, Saint T. Tapp and Jeffery E. James
Case Number: 1:2020cv00229
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from Timothy King- El, regarding prisoner trust account. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hms) Modified file date to 09/11/2020 on 9/21/2020 (hms).
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Timothy D. King-El. (Attachments: #1 attachment, #2 Envelope) (hms)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Timothy King- EL. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 09/08/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by Timothy D. King-El (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlj)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(reh)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Frank G. Johns, Clerk of Court, on 8/19/20. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(rth)
August 19, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. (rth)
August 19, 2020 Pro Se Law Clerk Referral to PSLC: 1 (rth)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:20-ct-03261. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/19/2020. Copy served via US Mail: Timothy D. King-El 0227083, Scotland Correctional Institution, 22385 McGirts Bridge Rd., Laurinburg, NC 28353. (Castania, M) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 8/19/2020.]
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) filed by Timothy D. King-El. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 8/19/2020.] Modified text on 8/19/2020 (rth).
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffery E. James, Saint T. Tapp and Sgt. Wilson filed by Timothy D. King-El. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 8/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King-El v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint T. Tapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery E. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy D. King-El
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?