Shook v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Donna S Shook and Jean S. Penland
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00242
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPLY to Response to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Packer, Leslie) Modified text on 10/30/2020 (rth).
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Donna S Shook. Replies due by 10/30/2020 (Hensley, John)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Packer, Leslie)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Boston Scientific Corporation. Responses due by 10/23/2020 (Packer, Leslie)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Jackson, Christopher). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Boston Scientific Corporation answer due 10/9/2020. Text of Order: ORDER: The Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED through and including October 9, 2020. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 9/8/2020. (kkb)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(khm)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Ward Jackson on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Jackson, Christopher)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie C. Packer on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Packer, Leslie)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boston Scientific Corporation (Packer, Leslie)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Buncombe County Superior Court, case number 20-CVS-2590. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4655248), filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Buncombe Superior Court File)(Packer, Leslie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shook v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Christopher Ward Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna S Shook
Represented By: John C Hensley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean S. Penland
Represented By: John C Hensley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?