Harrison v. Nicholson
Plaintiff: Marquis Dechane Harrison
Defendant: Brandon Nicholson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00244
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 Pro Se MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Marquis Dechane Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hms)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Plaintiff's excessive force claim will pass initial review against Defendant Nicholson. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail a summons form to Plaintiff for Plaintiff to fill out and return for service of process on Defendant Nicholson by the US Marshal. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/19/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brandon Nicholson, filed by Marquis Dechane Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (ejb)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Marquis Dechane Harrison. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 10/05/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
September 22, 2020 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) provided by NCDPS Division of Prisons. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kby) Modified file date on 9/23/2020 (kby).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Pltf shall have 30 days in which to file the missing page of the #1 Complaint or amend his Complaint in accordance with the terms of this Order. If Pltf fails to do so, the Court will proceed with its frivolity review of the #1 Complaint as it was originally filed. The Clerk is instructed to mail Pltf a blank prisoner 1983 complaint form along with a copy of this Order. (Amended Complaint or missing page due by 10/13/2020.) Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/10/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by Clerk of Court on 9/9/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(reh)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Frank G. Johns, Clerk of Court, on 9/8/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(rth)
September 8, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. (rth)
September 8, 2020 Pro Se Law Clerk Referral to PSLC: 2 (rth)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:20-ct-03273. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
September 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Because it is the interest of justice, the court TRANSFERS the action to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina where venue is proper. The court also has not reviewed plaintiff's claims or considered plaintiff's pending motion to proceed without prepayment of fees, but the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina is better positioned to address those issues. Signed by District Judge Richard E. Myers II on 9/4/2020. Copy sent to Marquis Dechane Harrison, 1270886 Bertie Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 129, Windsor, NC 27983 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 9/8/2020.]
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) filed by Marquis Dechane Harrison. (Castania, M) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 9/8/2020.] Modified text on 9/8/2020 (rth).
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brandon Nicholson filed by Marquis Dechane Harrison (missing page 4). (Attachments: #1 Inner Envelope, #2 Outer Envelope) (Castania, M) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 9/8/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrison v. Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis Dechane Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?