Schwabel v. True Nature Education Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas Schwabel
Defendant: True Nature Education Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00300
Filed: October 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Notice to Richard Liebowitz: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 10/26/2020. (rth)
October 19, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:20-cv-02620. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to the Western District of North Carolina.Case transferred to District of Western District of North Carolina. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE.. SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 10/5/2020. (Tavarez, Jennifer) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION to transfer venue by Thomas Schwabel (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. An answer, motion to dismiss or a stipulation of dismissal must be filed by October 2, 2020. THERE WILL BE NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/4/2020. (Reyes, Ramon) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Thomas Schwabel. (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Thomas Schwabel Order (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to True Nature Education Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or appeal Regarding a Copyright. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Flanagan, Doreen) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/19/2020.]
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against True Nature Education Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12917217 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Thomas Schwabel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Liebowitz, Richard) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/19/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwabel v. True Nature Education Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Nature Education Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Schwabel
Represented By: Richard P. Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?