Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. The Southeast Biofeedback and Clinical Neuroscience Association et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Urszula Klich, The Southeast Biofeedback and Clinical Neuroscience Association, Adriana Steffens and Sylvia Whitmire
Case Number: 1:2020cv00302
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Urszula Klich served on 12/12/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service of Klich)(Krueger-Andes, Matthew)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to The Southeast Biofeedback and Clinical Neuroscience Association. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (khm)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support re #10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Southeast Biofeedback and Clinical Neuroscience Association by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Krueger-Andes, Matthew)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant Southeast Biofeedback and Clinical Neuroscience Association by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Krueger-Andes, Matthew)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sylvia Whitmire. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(khm)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. The Southeast Biofeedback and Clinical Neuroscience Association served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return Receipt)(Krueger-Andes, Matthew)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Sylvia Whitmire served on 10/27/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return Receipt)(Krueger-Andes, Matthew)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Adriana Steffens served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return Receipt)(Krueger-Andes, Matthew)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (reh)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer no longer assigned to case. (reh)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(reh)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ***Duplicate document deleted and Attachment: #(1) Exhibit A added to #1 Complaint. Modified on 10/22/2020, NEF regenerated (reh).
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Krueger-Andes, Matthew)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew William Krueger-Andes on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Krueger-Andes, Matthew)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Interpleader against Urszula Klich, Adriana Steffens, The Southeast Biofeedback and Clinical Neuroscience Association, Sylvia Whitmire ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4724826), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(Krueger-Andes, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2020: #1 Exhibit A - Deposit Account Agreement) (reh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. The Southeast Biofeedback and Clinical Neuroscience Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urszula Klich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Southeast Biofeedback and Clinical Neuroscience Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriana Steffens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Whitmire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew William Krueger-Andes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?