Sither v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mary Sither
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00303
Filed: October 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Notice to Clayton A. Clark, Philip J. Combs, William M. Gage, Lezzlie Elizabeth Hornsby, Shelley Van Natter Hutson, Christy D. Jones, Scott A. Love, William Michael Moreland, Christopher D. Morris, Susan M. Robinson, Kari L. Sutherland, David B. Thomas: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 10/30/2020. (rth)
October 23, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
October 23, 2020 Filing 60 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:12-cv-03491. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
October 21, 2020 Filing 59 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF #6397 Adoption of Memorandum Opinion and Order- Dr. Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF #6415 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF #6471 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF #6518 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Shelby Thames)(Clark, Clayton) (Modified on 10/22/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 58 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF #2664 Memorandum Opinion and Order- Dr. Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF #3510 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF #4180 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF #6299 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF #6494 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF #6535 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF #2649 Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF #3536 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Timothy Ulatowski, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF #4195 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Timothy Ulatowski, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF #5155 Order Adopting Memorandum and Order - Dr. Timothy Ulatowski, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF #6318 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Timothy Ulatowski, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF #6391 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Timothy Ulatowski, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF #6486 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Daniel Ulatowski, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF #6262 Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Elizabeth Mueller, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF #6339 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Elizabeth Mueller, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF #6444 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Elizabeth Mueller, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF #2723 Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF #3563 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF #4201 Order Adopting Memorandum and Opinion - Dr. Shelby Thames, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF #5154 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Shelby Thames)(Clark, Clayton) (Modified on 10/22/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 21, 2020 Filing 57 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF #2668 Memorandum Opinion and Order- Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF #3532 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF #4186 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF #5149 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF #6393 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF #6408 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF #6519 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF #6615 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF #2646 Order Adopting Memorandum and Order - Dr. Jimmy Mays, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF #3514 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Jimmy Mays, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF #4185 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and order - Dr. Jimmy Mays, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF #6271 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Jimmy Mays, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF #6341 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Jimmy Mays, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF #6459 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Jimmy Mays, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF #6530 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Jimmy Mays, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF #2667 Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Jerry Blaivas, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF #4197 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Jerry Blaivas, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF #5157 Order Adopting Memorandum and Opinion - Dr. Jerry Blaivas, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF #6269 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Jerry Blaivas, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF #6402 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Jerry Blaivas, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF #6497 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Jerry Blaivas, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF #22 Order Adopting Memorandum Opinion and Order - Dr. Jerry Blaivas)(Clark, Clayton) (Modified on 10/22/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 56 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) - Pls' Mem in Supp of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (7323) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (7399) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/20/2020 to add party filer) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 55 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3610) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3612) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3757) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3848) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7300) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7416) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Elizabeth Mueller)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/20/2020 to add party filer) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 54 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) - Defs' Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Tim Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7461) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7467) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/20/2020 to add party filer) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 53 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2075) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2078) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2172) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2214) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2759) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (7335) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (7362) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/20/2020 to add party filer) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 52 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2038) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2038) Part 5 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2040) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2176) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2213) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3588) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3589) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3758) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3840) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7338) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (7353) - Notice of Adoption of Pl's Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jerry Blaivas)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/20/2020 to add party filer) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 51 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2071) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2071) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2071) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2074) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2144) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2209) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3031) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3642) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3642) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3647) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3751) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3847) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7336) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (7359) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7448) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/20/2020 to add party filer) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 50 CONTINUATION OF JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #49 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7342) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot and Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (7364) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/20/2020 to add party filer) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 20, 2020 Filing 49 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) - First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) - Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) - Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) - Amended Short Form Complaint)(Robinson, Susan) (Modified on 10/20/2020 to add party filer) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 10/23/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 10/22/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/9/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 47 RESPONSE by Mary Sither in opposition to #45 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #45 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Johnson & Johnson for Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
November 7, 2018 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Directing that each case on Exhibit A is reinstated to the active docket with the scheduling deadlines in PTO # 298 remaining in place; the Clerk is DIRECTED to remove the Inactive flag in each case listed in Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/23/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family Members on dates and at times to be determined. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Sither for Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admissions. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Shelley Van Natter Hutson on behalf of Mary Sither. (Hutson, Shelley) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 5, 2018 Filing 38 RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA for Dr. James Theofrastous. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
October 4, 2018 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) (Modified on 10/5/2018 to remove party filer)(rmc). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. James Theofrastous on 10/11/18 at 1:00 p.m. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Lezzlie Elizabeth Hornsby on behalf of Mary Sither. (Hornsby, Lezzlie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
September 17, 2018 Filing 34 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Mary Sither on 9/26/18 at 10:00 a.m. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Morris, Christopher) (Modified on 9/17/2018 to remove party filers)(rmc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Lezzlie Elizabeth Hornsby on behalf of Mary Sither. (Hornsby, Lezzlie) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Mary Sither on 9/26/18 at 9:00 a.m. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Sither for Answers to Ethicon Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories, Responses to Ethicon Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Production and Responses to Ethicon Inc.'s First Set of Requests for Admissions. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 29 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Mary Sither. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 29, 2018 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mary Sither for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Clark, Clayton) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 MOTION by Derek H. Potts to Withdraw as Counsel on behalf of Mary Sither; the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Derek H. Potts and Timothy L. Sifers as counsel for the plaintiff. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/21/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION by Derek H. Potts to Withdraw as Counsel on behalf of Mary Sither (Potts, Derek) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 24 NON-REVISION ELECTION FORM: Continuing with the presently pending case without any waiver pursuant to the Pretrial Order; filed by Mary Sither. (Moreland, W.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PRETRIAL ORDER # 298 FIRST AMENDED ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES This amended order revises certain future deadlines and addresses filing instructions regarding the Ethicon Election Form; the Order has been amended at paragraphs 2-5, paragraph 8(B)-(H), and Exhibit B; however, the remainder of this Order is substantively identical to PTO No. 293; if a plaintiff has already filed her Ethicon Election Form pursuant to the deadlines imposed by PTO No. 293, she is not required to re-file an Election Form; if an Election Form has not been filed it must be filed in each individual member case no later than 7/10/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/15/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (btm) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (brn) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL ORDER # 293 ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITION OF NON-REVISION GYNECARE TVT PRODUCTS CASES The Motion filed at ECF No. 5313 in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Order Regarding Disposition of Non-Revision Gynecare TVT Products Cases is GRANTED; each Non-Revised Plaintiff identified on the Second Amended Exhibit "A", together with any of her derivative plaintiffs with an existing MDL lawsuit, shall file an election form (Exhibit B to this Order) in each individual case no later than 6/10/2018; the deadlines for discovery and trial preparation procedures are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/11/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on the Second Amended Exhibit A) (rec) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER Having been advised by counsel that in the cases listed on the attached Exhibit A, the plaintiffs and Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, and where named, Ethicon, LLC have agreed to a mutual stay of activity. The Court finds it unnecessary to conduct further proceedings or to keep these cases on the active docket and ORDERS as follows: 1) all discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the Court, 2) the Clerk is directed to retire each of the cases listed on the attached Exhibit A from the active docket, 3) any case listed on Exhibit A that has not been dismissed or does not have a motion to reinstate to the active docket filed with the court for consideration by 3/31/2018 will be reinstated to the active docket by order of the court with a shortened Docket Control Order. This Order is linked to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 5045. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/15/2017. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (rec) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER on Motions filed in MDL 2327: granting MOTION by Derek H. Potts and The Potts Law Firm, LLP for Change of Address in this MDL and in each individual member case in which The Potts Law Firm, LLP is associated; granting MOTION by Patricia L. Campbell to Withdraw as Counsel of Record on behalf of Certain Plaintiffs; and granting MOTION by Brandon L. Corl to Withdraw as Counsel of Record on behalf of Certain Plaintiffs. The Clerk is DIRECTED to update the firm address both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Derek H. Potts is associated. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to terminate Patricia L. Campbell and Brandon L. Corl both on the main master docket and in each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which they appear. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 09/07/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (rec) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
June 20, 2017 Filing 17 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Mary Sither. (Moreland, W.) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
April 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER regarding the MOTION filed in MDL 2327 by The Potts Law Firm, LLP, Derek H. Potts, William H. Barfield, Timothy L. Sifers, Patricia L. Campbell, Brandon L. Corl and Michael K. Whitman For Change of Attorney Information in MDL No. 2327 and in each individual member case in which they are associated, as set forth more fully herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/8/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Based on representation of counsel that Laura H. Dixon no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above named counsel is terminated where she appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/5/2014. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (all) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
December 17, 2012 Filing 14 AMENDED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT filed by Mary Sither against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson,. (Love, Scott) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Based on representations of counsel that Bret A. Clark no longer represents any party in this MDL or any party in any member case, the above-named counsel is terminated where he appears as counsel for any party in this MDL and in any member case. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 11/26/2012. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Susan M. Robinson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Robinson, Susan) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Philip J. Combs on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Combs, Philip) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 21, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 10, 2012 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Ethicon, Inc. re: #1 Complaint. Ethicon, Inc. served on 8/2/2012, answer due 8/23/2012. (Love, Scott) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 8, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 8, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Laura H. Dixon on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Dixon, Laura) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 8, 2012 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED for Johnson & Johnson, Inc. re: #1 Complaint. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. served on 8/2/2012, answer due 8/23/2012. (Love, Scott) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 7, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
August 7, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED by the Clerk on behalf of Mary Sither for Ethicon, Inc., and Johnson & Johnson, Inc., re: #1 Complaint, returnable 21 days. Original Summons and 2 copies of each mailed to Clayton Clark for service. (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
July 23, 2012 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER 10 (Lifting Stay on Discovery) entered on 06/14/2012 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]
July 20, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $350.00. Receipt # 0425-1918310. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 10/23/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sither v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Christopher D. Morris
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Christopher D. Morris
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: Philip J. Combs
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Christopher D. Morris
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sither
Represented By: Scott Anthony Love
Represented By: Clayton A. Clark
Represented By: William Michael Moreland
Represented By: Shelley Van Natter Hutson
Represented By: Lezzlie Elizabeth Hornsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?