Johnson et al v. Ablest, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rika O. Johnson
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc., Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Covil Corporation, William Powell Company, Crane Co., Great Barrier Insulation Co., Ablest, Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Toledo Engineering Co., Inc., General Electric Company, Grinnell LLC doing business as Grinnell Corporation, Aurora Pump Company, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Enterprises, Inc., Daniel Construction Company, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, J & L Insulation, Inc., Fluor Corporation, Warren Pumps, LLC, CBS Corporation and Viacom, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00336
Filed: November 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J & L Insulation, Inc. (Williamson, Stephen)
February 8, 2021 Filing 60 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by J & L Insulation, Inc..(Williamson, Stephen)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Alexandra H. Austin admitted to practice in this action and added to case docket for Ablest, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/12/2021. (Attorney Austin served with this Order via NEF at aaustin@nexsenpruet.com) (maf) Modified text to reflect proper judge on 1/13/2021. NEF Regenerated. (maf)
January 13, 2021 Notice to Alexandra H. Austin: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov by 1/20/2021. (Attorney Austin served with this Notice via NEF at aaustin@nexsenpruet.com) (maf)
January 12, 2021 Filing 58 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by William Powell Company.(Oakley, David)
January 12, 2021 Filing 57 Corporate Disclosure Statement by William Powell Company (Oakley, David)
January 12, 2021 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Oakley on behalf of William Powell Company (Oakley, David)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. J & L Insulation, Inc. answer due 2/8/2021. Text of Order: The Defendant J&L Insulation, Inc.'s Motion is GRANTED, and this Defendant shall have an additional thirty (30) days, through and including February 8, 2021, within which to serve its Answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs Complaint. So Ordered. Entered by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/12/21. (LMR)
January 11, 2021 Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf no longer assigned to case. (thh)
January 8, 2021 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by J & L Insulation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williamson, Stephen). Modified referral on 1/11/2021 (thh).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Carl E. Pierce, II is admitted, on behalf of Great Barrier Insulation Co., to practice pro hac vice before the Court in this matter while associated with local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/8/2021. (maf)
January 8, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alexandra H. Austin Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4840548. by Ablest, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Santos, Peter). Modified referral on 1/11/2021 (thh).
January 8, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Carl E. Pierce, II Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4839895. by Great Barrier Insulation Co.. (Lambeth, Carter). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
January 8, 2021 Notice to Carl E. Pierce, II: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. by 1/15/2021. (Attorney Pierce served with a copy of this Notice and the #54 Order via NEF @ carlpierce@piercesloan.com) (maf)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #50 Motion and ADMITS Cheryl D. Shoun to practice pro hac vice before the Court while associated with local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/5/2021. (maf)
January 5, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Cheryl D. Shoun Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4834952. by Ablest, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Santos, Peter). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 29, 2020 Filing 49 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ViacomCBS Inc. (Techman, Jennifer)
December 29, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Techman on behalf of ViacomCBS Inc. (Techman, Jennifer)
December 29, 2020 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by ViacomCBS Inc..(Techman, Jennifer)
December 28, 2020 Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ablest, Inc. (Santos, Peter)
December 28, 2020 Filing 45 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ablest, Inc..(Santos, Peter)
December 23, 2020 Filing 44 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Pump Company (O'Neill, Mary)
December 23, 2020 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Aurora Pump Company.(O'Neill, Mary)
December 23, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Sullivan on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Sullivan, Kimberly)
December 23, 2020 Filing 41 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc. (Major, Christopher)
December 23, 2020 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Major, Christopher)
December 23, 2020 Filing 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation (Major, Christopher)
December 23, 2020 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daniel International Corporation (Major, Christopher)
December 23, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of Grinnell LLC (Starr, William)
December 23, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of Goulds Pumps, Incorporated (Starr, William)
December 23, 2020 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grinnell LLC (Tomlin, Tracy)
December 23, 2020 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Grinnell LLC.(Tomlin, Tracy)
December 23, 2020 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goulds Pumps, Incorporated (Tomlin, Tracy)
December 23, 2020 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Goulds Pumps, Incorporated.(Tomlin, Tracy)
December 21, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis J. Shipley on behalf of Covil Corporation (Shipley, Curtis)
December 21, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Scottie Forbes Lee on behalf of Covil Corporation (Lee, Scottie)
December 21, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Leslie C. Packer on behalf of Covil Corporation (Packer, Leslie)
December 21, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite on behalf of Covil Corporation (Brathwaite, Ashley)
December 21, 2020 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Covil Corporation (Brathwaite, Ashley)
December 21, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Covil Corporation.(Brathwaite, Ashley)
December 21, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E. Frick on behalf of Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Frick, Scott)
December 21, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by W. David Conner on behalf of Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (Conner, W.)
December 21, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Moffatt G. McDonald on behalf of Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc. (McDonald, Moffatt)
December 21, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc..(Major, Christopher)
December 21, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Fluor Enterprises, Inc..(Major, Christopher)
December 21, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Fluor Daniel Services Corporation.(Major, Christopher)
December 21, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Daniel International Corporation.(Major, Christopher)
December 16, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Techman on behalf of General Electric Company (Techman, Jennifer)
December 16, 2020 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Electric Company (Techman, Jennifer)
December 16, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by General Electric Company.(Techman, Jennifer)
December 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawna Forbes-King on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Forbes-King, Shawna)
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crane Co..(Mather, Emily)
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co. (Mather, Emily)
December 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily K. Mather on behalf of Crane Co. (Mather, Emily)
December 16, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Marla Tun Reschly on behalf of Crane Co. (Reschly, Marla)
December 15, 2020 Notice to Shawna Forbes-King: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 12/22/2020. (hms)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Admits Shawna Forbes-King to practice pro hac vice before the Court in this matter while associated with local counsel. Signed by Judge Carleton Metcalf on 12/14/2020. (hms) NEF regenerated. Modified text on 12/15/2020 (hms).
December 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Shawna Forbes-King Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4804386. by Rika O. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Admitting Shawna Forbes-King) (Graham, William). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine M. Pitt on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Pitt, Jasmine)
December 13, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps, LLC (Bennett, Joshua)
December 13, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Bennett, Joshua)
December 7, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Barrier Insulation Co. (Lambeth, Carter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Great Barrier Insulation Co..(Lambeth, Carter)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Carter T. Lambeth on behalf of Great Barrier Insulation Co. (Lambeth, Carter)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ablest, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Covil Corporation, Crane Co., Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Great Barrier Insulation Co., Grinnell LLC, J & L Insulation, Inc., Rika O. Johnson, Toledo Engineering Co., Inc., ViacomCBS Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, William Powell Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (maf)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT , with Jury Demand, filed by Jackie Lee Johnson against All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0419-4773525) (Graham, William) Modified docket text on 11/23/2020. (maf) Modified text on 12/1/2020 (rth).
November 23, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. Ablest, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel International Corporation
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covil Corporation
Represented By: Curtis J. Shipley
Represented By: Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite
Represented By: Leslie C. Packer
Represented By: Scottie Forbes Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company
Represented By: David B Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Emily K. Mather
Represented By: Marla Tun Reschly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Barrier Insulation Co.
Represented By: Carl E. Pierce, III
Represented By: Carter T. Lambeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ablest, Inc.
Represented By: Cheryl D. Shoun
Represented By: Peter A. Santos
Represented By: Alexandra H. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toledo Engineering Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC doing business as Grinnell Corporation
Represented By: William M. Starr
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Kimberly Sullivan
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Constructors International, Inc.
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Daniel Services Corporation
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & L Insulation, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen B. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor Corporation
Represented By: W. David Conner
Represented By: Scott E. Frick
Represented By: Christopher B. Major
Represented By: Moffatt G. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Joshua H. Bennett
Represented By: Jasmine M. Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rika O. Johnson
Represented By: William M. Graham
Represented By: Shawna Forbes-King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?