Bantin et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gregory R. Bantin and Julie L. Bantin
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., FMC Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Metalclad Insulation Corporation, Velan Valve Corp., Aurora Pump Company, McNally Industries, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Armstrong International, Inc., Carrier Corporation, The William Powell Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Crane Co., IMO Industries, Inc. and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00341
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Metalclad Insulation LLC.(Derrenbacher, Christopher)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metalclad Insulation LLC (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Derrenbacher on behalf of Metalclad Insulation LLC (Derrenbacher, Christopher)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Dedman, IV on behalf of Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Dedman, James)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Armstrong International, Inc..(Peck, Timothy)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hopeman Brothers, Inc. answer due 2/4/2021. Text of Order: ORDER: Defendant Hopeman Brothers, Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for Hopeman Brothers, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is EXTENDED by thirty days, through and including February 4, 2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/6/2021. (kkb)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Hopeman Brothers, Inc.. (Dedman, James). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McNally Industries, LLC (Santos, Peter)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Amy H. Geddes for FMC Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/4/2021. (rhf)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Amy H. Geddes Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4830564. by FMC Corporation, McNally Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Santos, Peter). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Pump Company (O'Neill, Mary)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Aurora Pump Company.(O'Neill, Mary)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (O'Neill, Mary)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Sullivan on behalf of Aurora Pump Company (Sullivan, Kimberly)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by McNally Industries, LLC.(Santos, Peter)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FMC Corporation (Santos, Peter)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by FMC Corporation.(Santos, Peter)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by The William Powell Company.(Oakley, David)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The William Powell Company (Oakley, David)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Oakley on behalf of The William Powell Company (Oakley, David)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velan Valve Corp. (Peck, Timothy)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Velan Valve Corp..(Peck, Timothy)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Armstrong International, Inc. (Peck, Timothy)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Armstrong International, Inc..(Peck, Timothy)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Starr, William)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of Carrier Corporation (Starr, William)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Starr, William)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. (Tomlin, Tracy)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc..(Tomlin, Tracy)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrier Corporation (Tomlin, Tracy)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Carrier Corporation.(Tomlin, Tracy)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Tomlin, Tracy)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Tomlin, Tracy)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Crane Co..(Mather, Emily)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co. (Mather, Emily)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily K. Mather on behalf of Crane Co. (Mather, Emily)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Marla Tun Reschly on behalf of Crane Co. (Reschly, Marla)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Metalclad Insulation LLC answer due 1/20/2021. Text of Order: The Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Metalclad Insulation, LLC is GRANTED, and the deadline for Metalclad Insulation, LLC to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is EXTENDED by thirty (30) days, through and including January 20, 2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/17/2020. (kkb)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Derrenbacher, Christopher). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Coltrain, Keith)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and to Cross-Claims of any and all other Defendants and Third-Party Defendants by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.(Coltrain, Keith)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith E. Coltrain on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Coltrain, Keith)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David C. Humen for Gregory R. Bantin and Julie L. Bantin. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/15/2020. (rhf)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Ethan A. Horn for Gregory R. Bantin and Julie L. Bantin. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/15/2020. (rhf)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice to David C. Humen: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 12/22/2020. (rhf)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice to Ethan A. Horn: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 12/22/2020. (rhf)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David C. Humen Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4805035. by Gregory R. Bantin, Julie L. Bantin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Admitting David C. Humen) (Graham, William). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ethan A. Horn Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4804983. by Gregory R. Bantin, Julie L. Bantin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Admitting Ethan A. Horn) (Graham, William). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine M. Pitt on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Pitt, Jasmine)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries, Inc. (Bennett, Joshua)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by IMO Industries, Inc..(Bennett, Joshua)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine M. Pitt on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Pitt, Jasmine)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps, LLC (Bennett, Joshua)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Bennett, Joshua)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (rhf)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4776600), filed by Julie L. Bantin, Gregory R. Bantin.(Graham, William) Modified text on 11/24/2020. (khm) Modified text on 12/1/2020 (rth).
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rhf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bantin et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Christopher J Derrenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Represented By: William M. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Amy H. Geddes
Represented By: Peter A. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Represented By: William M. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J Derrenbacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Kimberly Sullivan
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNally Industries, LLC
Represented By: Peter A. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Joshua H. Bennett
Represented By: Jasmine M. Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Represented By: William M. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: David B Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Emily K. Mather
Represented By: Marla Tun Reschly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua H. Bennett
Represented By: Jasmine M. Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith E. Coltrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory R. Bantin
Represented By: William M. Graham
Represented By: Ethan A Horn
Represented By: David C. Humen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie L. Bantin
Represented By: William M. Graham
Represented By: Ethan A Horn
Represented By: David C. Humen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?