Robinson v. Pardee UNC Healthcare et al
Plaintiff: Melvin Richard Robinson, III
Defendant: Southeastern Sports Medicine and Orthopedic and Pardee UNC Healthcare
Case Number: 1:2020cv00372
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 USCA Case Number 21-1149 for #6 Notice of Appeal, USCA Case Manager: Jeffrey S. Neal. (hms)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal. (hms)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re: #6 Notice of Appeal. (hms)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #4 Order that Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Clerk's Judgment by Melvin Richard Robinson, III. (IFP). (Attachments: #1 SEALED Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (hms) Modified text on 2/3/2021. (khm)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 1/11/2021. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Plaintiff's #1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim; Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is GRANTED; and Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 1/9/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Melvin Richard Robinson, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rhf). Modified on 12/21/2020 - Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (khm)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melvin Richard Robinson, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rhf) Modified on 12/21/2020 - Motions no longer referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (khm)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Melvin Richard Robinson, III. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Medical Records, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Envelope)(rhf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Pardee UNC Healthcare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeastern Sports Medicine and Orthopedic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pardee UNC Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Richard Robinson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?