Howald v. Ben Lippen School
Plaintiff: Rachel Howald
Defendant: Ben Lippen School, Pamela Kaye Herrington and Columbia Bible College
Case Number: 1:2021cv00059
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Change Venue Defendant Ben Lippen School's Motion to Transfer Venue and its Supporting Memorandum by Rachel Howald. Replies due by 5/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Opposition to Defendant Ben Lippen's Motion to Transfer Venue)(Riordan, John)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Amended) for Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Ben Lippen School's Motion for Change of Venue by Rachel Howald. (Riordan, John) Modified text on 4/16/2021 (kby).
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 MOTION to Change Venue Responses due by 4/26/2021 Text of Order: ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Ben Lippen School, an assumed business name for Columbia International University (formerly known as Columbia Bible College)'s Motion to Change Venue is GRANTED, and the deadline for Plaintiff to file a response is EXTENDED through and including April 26, 2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 4/14/2021. (kkb)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #17 MOTION to Change Venue by Rachel Howald. Responses due by 4/27/2021 (Riordan, John). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Change Venue by Ben Lippen School. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Don Jones)(Stetson, Hannah)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Change Venue by Ben Lippen School. Responses due by 4/14/2021 (Stetson, Hannah). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by Ben Lippen School.(Stetson, Hannah)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Withdrawal of document by Ben Lippen School ***Documents terminated: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Ben Lippen School. (Stetson, Hannah)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Text of Order: The Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Ben Lippen School, an assumed business name for Columbia International University (formerly known as Columbia Bible College)'s Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and the deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to the Motion to Dismiss is EXTENDED by seven (7) days, through and including March 29, 2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/22/2021. (kkb)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rachel Howald. Responses due by 4/2/2021 (Riordan, John). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Text of Order: ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Ben Lippen School, an assumed business name for Columbia International University (formerly known as Columbia Bible College)'s Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and the deadline for Plaintiff to file a response to the Motion to Dismiss is EXTENDED through and including March 22, 2021. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/12/2021. (kkb)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Rachel Howald. Responses due by 3/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Riordan, John). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/9/2021. (kby)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 3/9/2021. (kby)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Peter B. Janci: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/16/2021. (kby)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Basyle Tchividjian: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/16/2021. (kby)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Basyle Tchividjian , Esquire Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4930203. by Rachel Howald. (Riordan, John). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Peter Janci , Esquire Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4929303. by Rachel Howald. (Riordan, John). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Acknowledgment of Removal by Ben Lippen School (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Acknowledgment)(Stetson, Hannah)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ben Lippen School re #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Stetson, Hannah) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/1/2021 with corrected .pdf) NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ben Lippen School re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Stetson, Hannah) (Main Document 6 replaced on 3/1/2021 with corrected .pdf) NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ben Lippen School re #1 Notice of Removal, (Stetson, Hannah) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/1/2021 with corrected .pdf) NEF Regenerated. (ejb)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf: #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (hms)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Attorney John B. Riordan: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Satisfy the Requirements for Admission to the Western District of North Carolina Federal Court. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/8/2021. (hms)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Attorney Jonathan S. Shbeeb: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Satisfy the Requirements for Admission to the Western District of North Carolina Federal Court. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/8/2021. (hms)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Attorney Peter Janci: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to File a motion pro hac vice. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/8/2021. (hms)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice to Attorney Basyle Tchividjian: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to File a motion pro hac vice. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/8/2021. (hms)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ben Lippen School (Stetson, Hannah)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ben Lippen School. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents)(Stetson, Hannah) (Main Document 3 replaced on 3/1/2021, with pdf reflecting correct case number) (hms). Modified on 3/1/2021 (hms).
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ben Lippen School. Responses due by 3/12/2021 (Stetson, Hannah) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/1/2021, with pdf reflecting correct case number) (hms). Modified on 3/1/2021 (hms).
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Buncombe County Superior Court, case number 2021cv00205. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4917277), filed by Ben Lippen School. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #3 Cover Sheet)(Stetson, Hannah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howald v. Ben Lippen School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Howald
Represented By: John Brendan Riordan
Represented By: Basyle Tchividjian
Represented By: Peter B. Janci
Represented By: Jonathan Sami Shbeeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Lippen School
Represented By: Hannah Davis Stetson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Kaye Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia Bible College
Represented By: Hannah Davis Stetson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?