Mason v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Devin L Mason
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00061
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Kenneth D Bell
Referring Judge: David S Cayer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Set Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/17/2021 (nvc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 19 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. Responses due by 4/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Osowski, Paul). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #19 Motion to Stay. This matter is STAYED ninety days from the date of this Order. The parties shall file a status report thirty days from the date of this Order and every thirty days thereafter. So Ordered. Entered by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/15/2021. (DLG)
March 25, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 4/15/2021. (nvc)
March 22, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL Master Answer)(Osowski, Paul)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 , #15 , #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Mark E. Chavez,David P. Matthews, and Richard A. Freese for Devin L Mason (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/8/21. (mga)
March 8, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Richard A. Freese Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4929144. by Devin L Mason. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing USDC) (Kinsley, Brian). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 8, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David P. Matthews Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4929086. by Devin L Mason. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Kinsley, Brian). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 8, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark E. Chavez Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4929068. by Devin L Mason. (Kinsley, Brian). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
March 8, 2021 Notice to Richard A. Freese: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/15/2021. Modified Text and regenerated NEF on 3/8/2021 (mga).
March 8, 2021 Notice to Mark E. Chavez: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/15/2021. (mga) Modified text and regenerated NEF on 3/8/2021 (mga).
March 8, 2021 Notice to David P. Matthews : Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/15/2021. (mga) Modified text and regenerated NEF on 3/8/2021 (mga).
March 5, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Leighton Kinsley on behalf of Devin L Mason (Kinsley, Brian)
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Starr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated (Starr, William)
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Osowski, Paul)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C R Bard Incorporated (Osowski, Paul)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Paul Joseph Osowski on behalf of C R Bard Incorporated, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. (Osowski, Paul)
March 2, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-03768. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
March 2, 2021 Notice to David P Matthews, Richard Arthur Freese: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Associate local counsel and File a motion pro hac vice. (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 3/9/2021. (rth)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Western District of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 MDL Certified Docket, #2 Case Management Order No. 47, #3 Case Management Orders, #4 Daubert Orders, #5 Deposition Designation Orders, #6 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #7 Discovery Orders, #8 Master and Short Form Pleadings, #9 Miscellaneous Orders, #10 Motions in Limine Orders)(rth)
February 24, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(rth)
February 24, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of North Carolina via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/2/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/2/2021.]
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 *AMENDED By doc. #6 *SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/17/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 3/2/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 49 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated. The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/1/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/2/2021.]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 20900 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 11/20/19. (MAP) *Modified on 2/8/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 3/2/2021.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-3768-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/2/2021.]
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16156656 filed by Devin L Mason. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 3/2/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mason v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Paul Joseph Osowski
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: William M. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Osowski
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: William M. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin L Mason
Represented By: David P. Matthews
Represented By: Richard Arthur Freese
Represented By: Brian Leighton Kinsley
Represented By: Mark E. Chavez
Represented By: Richard A. Freese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?