Industrial Services Group, Inc. v. Dobson et al
Plaintiff: Industrial Services Group, Inc. doing business as Universal Blastco
Defendant: Kevin Beauregard and Josh Dobson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00090
Filed: March 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kevin Beauregard, Josh Dobson (Phipps, Stacey)
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey A Phipps on behalf of All Defendants (Phipps, Stacey) (Main Document 10 replaced on 4/23/2021) (hms).
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin Beauregard. Kevin Beauregard waiver sent on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Phipps, Stacey)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Josh Dobson. Josh Dobson waiver sent on 4/5/2021, answer due 6/4/2021. (Phipps, Stacey)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kevin Beauregard. All Defendants. (Voight, Victoria)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Josh Dobson. All Defendants. (Voight, Victoria)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 Disregard docket entry, entered in error by Attorney. Incorrect document filed. NEF regenerated. Modified on 4/13/2021 (hms).
April 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria L. Voight on behalf of All Defendants (Voight, Victoria)
April 12, 2021 Filing 3 Disregard Docket Entry, by Victoria L. Voight. Attorney Stacey Phipps is not admitted to practice in the Western District of North Carolina. NEF regenerated. Modified on 4/13/2021 (hms).
April 1, 2021 NOTICE: Case was filed in wrong division. Case has been copied from 3:21-cv-00135 to 1:21-cv-00090. Please use 1:21-cv-00090 for all future pleadings. (tlj)
April 1, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tlj)
March 31, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Industrial Services Group, Inc. (Vance, Travis) Modified on 4/1/2021 to correct docket text (tlj).
March 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4965126), filed by Industrial Services Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Vance, Travis) Modified on 4/1/2021 to correct docket text (tlj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Industrial Services Group, Inc. v. Dobson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Industrial Services Group, Inc. doing business as Universal Blastco
Represented By: Travis Wayne Vance
Represented By: David Isaac Klass
Represented By: Benjamin Scott Morrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Beauregard
Represented By: Stacey A Phipps
Represented By: Victoria L. Voight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Dobson
Represented By: Stacey A Phipps
Represented By: Victoria L. Voight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?