Garrett v. Tomas, et al
Plaintiff: Donna Garrett
Defendant: Wendy Buchanan, Dr. Don Tomas, Trustees of Southwestern Community College, Dr. Mitch Fischer, Dr. Thom Brooks, Mitch Fischer, Thom Brooks and Don Tomas
Case Number: 1:2021cv00110
Filed: April 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Thom Brooks, Wendy Buchanan, Mitch Fischer, Don Tomas, Trustees of Southwestern Community College. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case law)(Santaniello, Andrew)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander J. Elmes on behalf of All Defendants (Elmes, Alexander)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Donna Garrett. Replies due by 5/13/2021 (Williams, Eric)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Thom Brooks, Wendy Buchanan, Mitch Fischer, Don Tomas, Trustees of Southwestern Community College. (Santaniello, Andrew)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Thom Brooks, Wendy Buchanan, Mitch Fischer, Don Tomas, Trustees of Southwestern Community College. Responses due by 5/6/2021 (Santaniello, Andrew). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
April 21, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Board of Trustees of Southwestern Community College (Santaniello, Andrew)
April 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Haywood County Superior, case number 21 CvS 179. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4995031), filed by Wendy Buchanan, Trustees of Southwestern Community College, Thom Brooks, Mitch Fischer, Don Tomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Santaniello, Andrew) Modified text on 4/21/2021 (hms).
April 21, 2021 Set Deadlines: Thom Brooks, Wendy Buchanan, Mitch Fischer, Don Tomas, and Trustees of Southwestern Community College answers due 4/28/2021. (hms) Modified text on 4/21/2021 (ejb).
April 21, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (hms)
April 21, 2021 Notice to Eric Clifton Williams: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF Account #Application Link. Deadline by 4/28/2021. (hms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Tomas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Buchanan
Represented By: Andrew James Santaniello
Represented By: Alexander J. Elmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Don Tomas
Represented By: Andrew James Santaniello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustees of Southwestern Community College
Represented By: Andrew James Santaniello
Represented By: Alexander J. Elmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mitch Fischer
Represented By: Andrew James Santaniello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Thom Brooks
Represented By: Andrew James Santaniello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitch Fischer
Represented By: Andrew James Santaniello
Represented By: Alexander J. Elmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thom Brooks
Represented By: Andrew James Santaniello
Represented By: Alexander J. Elmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Tomas
Represented By: Andrew James Santaniello
Represented By: Alexander J. Elmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Garrett
Represented By: Eric Clifton Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?