Westveer v. Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut et al
Plaintiff: Cornelius Westveer
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut and The Phoenix Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00114
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Gemma Lillian Saluta on behalf of The Phoenix Insurance Company, Attorney James A. Dean terminated. (Saluta, Gemma)
June 18, 2021 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference RESCHEDULED to 7/1/2021 09:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Counsel for the parties shall call into the conference line five minutes prior to the conference, using the information previously provided. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kby)
June 17, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2021 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Counsel for the parties shall call into the conference line five minutes prior to the conference. Clerk will contact parties with call-in information. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kby)
June 3, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Niland, Ryan)
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cornelius Westveer (Bissette, Matthew)
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Stephen Bissette on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bissette, Matthew)
May 14, 2021 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 6/4/2021. (hms)
May 13, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal, by The Phoenix Insurance Company.(Dean, James)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut and Acceptance of Service as to The Phoenix Insurance Company by The Phoenix Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut (Dean, James)
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Hunter Niland on behalf of All Defendants (Niland, Ryan)
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Phoenix Insurance Company (Dean, James)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut (Dean, James)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Dean on behalf of All Defendants (Dean, James)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of Mitchell County, case number 21-CVS-24. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0419-4996692), filed by The Phoenix Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint)(Dean, James)
April 22, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westveer v. Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: James A. Dean
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: James A. Dean
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland
Represented By: Gemma Lillian Saluta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornelius Westveer
Represented By: Matthew Stephen Bissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?