Ketchersid v. Murphy
Plaintiff: James Larkin Ketchersid, Jr.
Defendant: Brett Murphy
Case Number: 1:2021cv00115
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Asheville Office
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by NCDPS on behalf of James Larkin Ketchersid, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hms)
June 11, 2021 Filing 8 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by James Larkin Ketchersid, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (rhf)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by James Larkin Ketchersid, Jr. Responses due by 6/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rhf)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
May 28, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by James Larkin Ketchersid, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (rhf)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by James Larkin Ketchersid, Jr. from Marion Correctional in Marion, NC to Maury Correctional in Maury, NC. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rhf)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (rhf)
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. The filing fee of $402.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 5/13/2021. (rhf)
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brett Murphy, filed by James Larkin Ketchersid, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rhf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ketchersid v. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Larkin Ketchersid, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?