Brice v. Morgan et al
Plaintiff: Romeal Brice
Defendant: M.E. Morgan and Shelby Police Department
Case Number: 1:2021cv00174
Filed: July 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 11 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 8/26/2021. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 8/26/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (rhf)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/26/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(rhf) Modified text on 8/26/2021 (rhf).
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 Mail (Order as to document #9 .) addressed to Romeal Brice returned as undeliverable, Inmate no longer confined. (hms)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiff shall have 10 days from the date of this Order in which to update his address of record and inform the Court whether he intends to proceed with this action. If Plaintiff fails to do so, this case will be dismissed without prejudice and closed without further notice as to him. (Show Cause Response due by 8/21/2021). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/11/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(rhf)
August 5, 2021 Filing 8 Mail #6 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee, returned as undeliverable as to Romeal Brice 194483, Gaston County Jail, 425 Dr. MLK Jr. Way, Gastonia, NC 28052. Inmate no longer at this facility. (hms) Modified on 8/9/2021 (hms).
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Romeal Brice. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rhf)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Waiving Initial Partial Filing Fee and Directing Monthly Payments be Made from Prison Account of Romeal Brice. Directing correctional facility to transmit payments. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 7/23/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(hms)
July 19, 2021 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) as to Romeal Brice submitted by Alan Cloninger, Sheriff of Gaston County. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ejb)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS re #1 Complaint (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
July 6, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) re #1 Complaint by Romeal Brice (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)
July 6, 2021 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against M.E. Morgan, Shelby Police Department, filed by Romeal Brice. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brice v. Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Romeal Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.E. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?