Rankin Bey v. Medical Private Contractor
Plaintiff: Napoleon J. Rankin Bey
Defendant: Medical Private Contractor
Case Number: 1:2021cv00175
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Full Payment be made from Prison Account of Napoleon J. Rankin Bey and directing correctional facility to transmit payments. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
July 29, 2021 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by NCDPS on behalf of Napoleon J. Rankin Bey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hms)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (hms)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS re #1 Complaint (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (rth)
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of North Carolina Eastern; Case Number 5:21-ct-03095. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
July 9, 2021 Pro Se Law Clerk Referral to PSLC: 1 (rth)
July 9, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger. (rth)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER transferring case. Signed by Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II on 7/8/2021. Copy served via US Mail: Napoleon J. Rankin Bey 0335883, Mountain View Correctional Institution, 545 Amity Park Road, Spruce Pine, NC 28777. (Castania, M) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/9/2021.]
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support regarding #1 Complaint filed by Napoleon J. Rankin Bey. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/9/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Medical Treatment filed by Napoleon J. Rankin Bey. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Lopez, R.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/9/2021.]
May 13, 2021 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II regarding #6 MOTION fro Medical Treatment. (Lopez, R.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/9/2021.]
April 22, 2021 Filing 5 Documents in Support regarding #1 Complaint filed by Napoleon J. Rankin Bey. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/9/2021.]
April 22, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) filed by Napoleon J. Rankin Bey. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/9/2021.]
April 22, 2021 Case Submitted to Chief Judge Richard E. Myers II for initial review. (Indig, A.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/9/2021.]
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY - You must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $402.00. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to correct the deficiencies listed above and return the corrected papers within twenty-one (21) days from the filing of this order. (Responses due by 5/3/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 4/12/2021. Copy of order and forms mailed to petitioner at Mountain View Correctional Institution via US Mail. (Lopez, R.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/9/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent to plaintiff at Mountain View Correctional via US Mail. (Lopez, R.) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/9/2021.]
April 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medical Private Contractor filed by Napoleon J. Rankin Bey. (Attachments: #1 Grievances, #2 Envelope) (Castania, M) [Transferred from North Carolina Eastern on 7/9/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rankin Bey v. Medical Private Contractor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Napoleon J. Rankin Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Private Contractor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?