Porter v. USA
Petitioner: Archie Orlando Porter
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2021cv00215
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of USCA remanding case for limited purpose as to #4 Notice of Appeal [21-7355]. (hms)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 USCA Case Number 21-7355 for #4 Notice of Appeal USCA Case Manager: Rachel J Lee. (rhf)
September 21, 2021 Filing 5 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #4 Notice of Appeal. (rhf)
September 21, 2021 Original Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit re: #4 Notice of Appeal. (rhf)
September 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order on Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), #3 Clerk's Judgment, by Archie Orlando Porter. (IFP) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rhf)
September 10, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 9/10/2021. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Petitioner's #1 Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) is GRANTED IN PART for the reasons stated herein. The Clerk is directed to prepare an Amended Judgment with same terms and conditions as Petitioner's Judgment filed on 8/13/2020 and submit it to the Court for consideration. Petitioner shall have 14 days from the entry of the Amended Judgment to file a Notice of Appeal to appeal to the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals. FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's remaining grounds for relief are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 9/10/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
August 10, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No. 1:19-cr-106 filed by Archie Orlando Porter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (USA2255Group added) (maf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Archie Orlando Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?