5-Star Athlete Development, LLC. v. City of Shelby
Plaintiff: 5-Star Athlete Development, LLC.
Defendant: City of Shelby
Case Number: 1:2021cv00225
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 9/30/2021. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/30/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the Plaintiffs' #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Retain Legal Counsel and Time to Pay Court Fees filed by Willie A. Green, Sr. is STRICKEN. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/13/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(kby)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 **STRICKEN pursuant to #8 Order.** MOTION for Extension of Time to Retain Legal Counsel and Time to Pay Court Fees by 5-Star Athlete Development, LLC. Responses due by 9/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (ejb) Modified to strike on 9/13/2021 (kby).
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that in the Court's discretion, the Plaintiff's deadline for filing a response to Defendant's #5 MOTION to Dismiss will be EXTENDED to and including 10/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 9/08/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by City of Shelby. Responses due by 9/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Leslie-Fite, Andrea). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Pltf 5-Star Athlete Development, LLC shall have 30 days from entry of this Order to retain counsel in this matter. Pltf advised that failure to retain counsel within time required will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice; and FURTHER ORDERING Pltf's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is STRICKEN. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/26/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 ***STRICKEN per #4 Order*** MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by 5-Star Athlete Development, LLC. (hms) Motions *no longer referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/16/2021: #1 Proposed Waiver of the Service of Summons) (hms). Modified *text on 8/23/2021 (ejb). Modified text on 8/26/2021 (ejb).
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY REQUEST against City of Shelby with Jury Demand, filed by 5-Star Athlete Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Envelope) (hms) Modified text on 8/16/2021 (hms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 5-Star Athlete Development, LLC. v. City of Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 5-Star Athlete Development, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shelby
Represented By: Andrea Leslie-Fite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?