Big C, LLC v. Graham County Land Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Big C, LLC
Defendant: Graham County Land Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00243
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Graham County Land Company, LLC. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (kby)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #6 MOTION for Entry of Default by Big C, LLC. (Frost, Joseph)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default by Big C, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service) (Frost, Joseph)
September 29, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Big C, LLC. Graham County Land Company, LLC served on 9/17/2021, answer due 10/8/2021. (Frost, Joseph)
September 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Graham County Land Company, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (hms)
September 13, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (hms)
September 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Z. Frost on behalf of Big C, LLC (Frost, Joseph)
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Big C, LLC (Frost, Joseph)
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Graham County Land Company, LLC with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5214867), filed by Big C, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subcontract Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Invoice No. 103, #3 Exhibit C - Invoice No. 104, #4 Exhibit D - Invoice No. 105, #5 Exhibit E - Invoice No. 106, #6 Exhibit F - Invoice No. 107, #7 Exhibit G - Second Demand Letter, #8 Exhibit H - Third Demand Letter, #9 Cover Sheet)(Frost, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big C, LLC v. Graham County Land Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big C, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Z. Frost
Represented By: Matthew William Buckmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graham County Land Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?