Gullum v. Endeavor Infrastructure Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence E. Gullum
Defendant: Endeavor Infrastructure Holdings, LLC, Anthony Buffa, Dane James and Endeavor Capital Management
Case Number: 1:2021cv00245
Filed: September 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 14 SURREPLY re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal, by Lawrence E. Gullum. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Affidavit in Support, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Certificate of Service) (hms) Modified to change event to Surreply, per chambers direction on 11/9/2021 (hms). NEF regenerated.
October 26, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal by Anthony Buffa, Endeavor Infrastructure Holdings, LLC. (Sharkey, Chad)
October 26, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal by Dane James. (Sharkey, Chad)
October 22, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal. Replies due by 10/26/2021. (rhf)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal & #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal by Lawrence E. Gullum. Replies due by 10/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Restraining Order and Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14) (rhf) Modified docket entry relationship on 10/22/2021, NEF regenerated (rhf).
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ROSEBORO ORDER Setting within 14 days of service of this Order Pltf's Response Deadline re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal filed by Dane James, and #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal filed by Anthony Buffa, and Endeavor Infrastructure Holdings, LLC. Pltf's Responses due by 10/22/2021. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 10/8/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
October 8, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal by Anthony Buffa, Endeavor Infrastructure Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Anthony Buffa)(Sharkey, Chad)
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal by Anthony Buffa, Endeavor Infrastructure Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 10/22/2021 (Sharkey, Chad)
October 8, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Endeavor Infrastructure Holdings, LLC (Sharkey, Chad)
October 8, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal by Dane James. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dane James)(Sharkey, Chad)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal by Dane James. Responses due by 10/22/2021 (Sharkey, Chad)
October 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A. Sharkey on behalf of Anthony Buffa, Endeavor Infrastructure Holdings, LLC, Dane James (Sharkey, Chad)
September 29, 2021 Filing Fee Received: $ 402, receipt number CHD067683 (tlj)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Reissued Conventionally as to Endeavor Infrastructure Holdings, LLC. and Issued c/o Endeavor Capital Management. Handed to Pltf Gullum at Public Counter. (ejb)
September 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Anthony Buffa, Endeavor Infrastructure Holdings, LLC, and Dane James, and handed to Pltf Gullum at public counter. (ejb)
September 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Endeavor Infrastructure Holdings, LLC, Anthony Buffa, Dane James, Endeavor Capital Management ($ 402 Filing fee received and forwarded to Charlotte Office to receipt), filed by Lawrence E. Gullum. (Attachments: #1 Complaint part 2 re: Summary Judgment, #2 Complaint part 3 re: Breach of Contract, #3 Complaint part 4 re: Request for Injunction, #4 Complaint part 5 re: Alleging Defendants Owing Plaintiff a Sum of Money, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Civil Cover Sheet) (ejb)
September 14, 2021 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. The document was served on Pltf Gullum conventionally at case filing. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gullum v. Endeavor Infrastructure Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence E. Gullum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endeavor Infrastructure Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Chad A. Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Buffa
Represented By: Chad A. Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dane James
Represented By: Chad A. Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endeavor Capital Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?