Brickle v. Federal Aviation Administration
Plaintiff: William Brickle
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00327
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 12/20/2021. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (khm)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this civil action. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/17/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (khm)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the Plaintiff shall have 30 days in which to amend his Complaint in accordance with the terms of this Order. If the Plaintiff fails to amend the Complaint in accordance with this Order and within the time limit set by the Court, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice to the Plaintiff. The Clerk is respectfully instructed to mail the Plaintiff a blank civil complaint form. (Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2021.) Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/8/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
November 8, 2021 Filing Fee Received: $ 402, receipt number CHD068373 (tlj)
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Conventionally as to Federal Aviation Administration, US Attorney and US Attorney General (Summons issued conventionally at Clerk's Office counter and given to Plaintiff). (rhf)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Aviation Administration (Filing fee $402 paid), filed by William Brickle. (rhf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brickle v. Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Brickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?