Walsh v. Lovin Contracting Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Secretary of Labor MARTIN J WALSH and Martin J. Walsh
Defendant: LOVIN CONTRACTING COMPANY, INC. and BRANDON LOVIN
Case Number: 1:2021cv00360
Filed: December 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Brandon Lovin, Lovin Contracting Company, Inc.. Responses due by 2/17/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Order) (Hall, Wendel). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
February 3, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Martin J. Walsh by Brandon Lovin, Lovin Contracting Company, Inc..(Hall, Wendel)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Wendel V. Hall for Lovin Contracting Company, Inc. and Brandon Lovin, (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 2/1/2022. (ejb)
February 1, 2022 Notice to Attorney Wendel V. Hall: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account #Link. (Attorney served via NEF.) Deadline by 2/8/2022. (ejb)
January 31, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Wendel V. Hall Filing fee $ 288, receipt number ANCWDC-5417172. by Brandon Lovin, Lovin Contracting Company, Inc.. (Wijewickrama, David). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Lovin Contracting Company, Inc. and Brandon Lovin. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb) NEF regenerated to Pltf's Attorney on 1/7/2022 (ejb).
December 17, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)
December 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Injunctive Relief Sought) against All Defendants, filed by *Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 *Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Lovin Contracting Company, Inc., #4 Summons - Brandon Lovin) (Graeber, Rachel) Modified *text on 12/20/2021 (ejb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. Lovin Contracting Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secretary of Labor MARTIN J WALSH
Represented By: Rachel L. Graeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Rachel L. Graeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOVIN CONTRACTING COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Wendel V. Hall, III
Represented By: David A Wijewickrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDON LOVIN
Represented By: Wendel V. Hall, III
Represented By: David A Wijewickrama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?