Kalk v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Robert Harrison Kalk
Defendant: Quinten Miller, Jeffrey Littrell and Buncombe County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 1:2022cv00019
Filed: February 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Buncombe County Sheriff's Department, Jeffrey Littrell, Quinten Miller. Responses due by 4/15/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Euler, Curtis)
February 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Harrison Kalk. Buncombe County Sheriff's Department waiver sent on 2/2/2022, answer due 4/4/2022; Jeffrey Littrell waiver sent on 2/2/2022, answer due 4/4/2022; Quinten Miller waiver sent on 2/2/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (maf)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis William Euler on behalf of All Defendants (Euler, Curtis)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing Fee Received: $ 402, receipt number CHD069720 (js)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Quinten Miller, Jeffrey Littrell, and Buncombe County Sheriff's Department, with Jury Demand ($ 402 Filing fee received and mailed to Charlotte Clerk's Office to receipt), filed by Robert Harrison Kalk. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kalk v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Harrison Kalk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinten Miller
Represented By: Curtis William Euler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Littrell
Represented By: Curtis William Euler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buncombe County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Curtis William Euler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?