Robinson v. Blue Ridge Neuropsychological Associates et al
Plaintiff: Melvin Richard Robinson, III
Defendant: Blue Ridge Neuropsychological Associates and Mark Hill
Case Number: 1:2022cv00083
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101 Americans With Disability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 6/6/2022. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns on 6/6/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (rhf)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failing to state a claim. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this civil action. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/6/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (rhf)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a renewed Application, using AO 239 (long form) and to amend his Complaint in accordance with the terms of this Order. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to the Plaintiff. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/25/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail with this Order and AO239 Long Form.) (maf)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melvin Richard Robinson, III. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rhf) Modified on 4/19/2022 to remove reference of referral to MJ. (maf)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Melvin Richard Robinson, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Envelope)(rhf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Blue Ridge Neuropsychological Associates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Richard Robinson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Ridge Neuropsychological Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?