American Safety Utility Corporation v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: American Safety Utility Corporation
Defendant: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00158
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 5 days. Discovery due by 6/5/2023. Motions due by 7/5/2023. Mediation deadline set for 6/20/2023. Ready Date for Trial set for 12/4/2023 09:31 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 9/15/2022. (kby)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #9 "Notice of Withdrawal" which the undersigned has construed as a Motion to Withdraw Fabienne Dominique Limage as counsel of record for Plaintiff. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED, and Fabienne Dominique Limage is WITHDRAWN as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 9/15/2022. (kby)
September 14, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Safety Utility Corporation (Hunoval, Christina)
September 14, 2022 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Dedman, James)
September 14, 2022 Minute Entry: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Plaintiffs attorney: Christina Hunoval. Defendants attorney: James Dedman, IV. An initial pretrial conference was held by video on September 14, 2022 with Christina Hunoval participating on behalf of Plaintiff American Safety Utility Corporation and James Dedman, IV participating on behalf of Defendant State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Counsel were directed to file corporate disclosure statements on or before September 16, 2022.(kkb)
September 12, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of substitution of counsel by American Safety Utility Corporation (Limage, Fabienne) Attorney Fabienne Limage terminated, attorney Christina R. Hunval added. Modified text on 9/14/2022 (clc).
September 1, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference (by video) set for 9/14/2022 09:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(kby)
August 30, 2022 Filing 8 Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Dedman, James)
August 29, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Rampey Hunoval on behalf of American Safety Utility Corporation (Hunoval, Christina)
August 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing of Executed Acknowledgment of State Court by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of State Court)(Dedman, James)
August 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Fabienne Dominique Limage on behalf of American Safety Utility Corporation (Limage, Fabienne)
August 18, 2022 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 9/8/2022. (ams)
August 17, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint contained in #1 Notice of Removal,, by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Dedman, James)
August 16, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Amended Notice of Removal by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Dedman, James)
August 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Dedman, IV on behalf of State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Dedman, James)
August 15, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Cleveland County Superior Court, case number 22-CVS-543. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5697272), filed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court *First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Proof of Service, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Proposed Acknowledgment of State Court, #6 Certificate of Service)(Dedman, James) Modified *text on 8/15/2022 (ejb).
August 15, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Safety Utility Corporation v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Safety Utility Corporation
Represented By: Fabienne Dominique Limage
Represented By: Christina Rampey Hunoval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?