Moses v. LPL Financial LLC
Plaintiff: Brandon Moses
Defendant: LPL Financial LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00238
Filed: November 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER terminating as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 12/13/2022. (ams)
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of intent not to file reply by Brandon Moses. (Veach, John)
November 16, 2022 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration or to Stay Proceeding Pending Arbitration by LPL Financial LLC. (Pocock, Donald)
November 16, 2022 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Tiffinee Walford re #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration or to Stay Proceeding Pending Arbitration filed by LPL Financial LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Moses Account Application, #3 Exhibit C - Account Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Email)(Pocock, Donald)
November 16, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Compel Arbitration or to Stay Proceeding Pending Arbitration by LPL Financial LLC. Responses due by 11/30/2022 (Pocock, Donald)
November 10, 2022 Filing 4 Attachment by LPL Financial LLC. Attachment to #3 Notice (Other) of Filing of Notice of Removal (Pocock, Donald)
November 10, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by LPL Financial LLC (Pocock, Donald)
November 9, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LPL Financial LLC (Pocock, Donald)
November 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from State of NC, County of Buncombe Superior Court, case number 22CV03767. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5822223), filed by LPL Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court filing, #2 Exhibit B - MA Corporations Search Entity Summary, #3 Cover Sheet)(Pocock, Donald)
November 9, 2022 Notice to Attorney John B. Veach, III: You are required to #Link your PACER Account to your NCWD ECF Account. Deadline by 11/16/2022. (ejb)
November 9, 2022 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moses v. LPL Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Moses
Represented By: John B. Veach, III
Represented By: John B Veach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPL Financial LLC
Represented By: Donald R. Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?