Short v. Boyd et al
Plaintiff: Todd W. Short
Defendant: Michael Boyd and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2023cv00207
Filed: August 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd W. Short. Michael Boyd served on 8/28/2023, answer due 10/27/2023. (smm)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Michael Boyd, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM285 Forms) (slm)
August 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Plaintiff's #4 Motion to Delay Issuance of Summons and Complaint is DENIED. To the extent Plaintiff's #5 Motion seeks permission for Plaintiff to receive electronic notices of filings, the Motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk is respectfully directed to provide Plaintiff with electronic notice at the email address listed in the Motion. To the extent Plaintiff's #5 Motion seeks permission for Plaintiff to file documents electronically, the Motion is DENIED. Signed by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/24/2023. (Pro se litigant served by NEF.) (slm) Modified text on 8/31/2023 (kby).
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Receive Docketed Pleading(s) and Orders in this case via email, or have limited access to Pacer and to serve defendants by electronic means by Todd W. Short. (smm). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Delay Issuance of Summons and Complaint by Todd W. Short. (smm). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff's #2 Application is GRANTED, and Plaintiff is permitted to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee or giving security therefor. The Court further DIRECTS that: a. To the extent he has not already done so, on or before August 31, 2023, Plaintiff shall prepare summonses for Defendants and submit the summonses to the Clerk. b. After the summonses have been received and issued, the Clerk is respectfully directed to deliver process to the United States Marshal's Service. c. The United States Marshal's Service shall serve process upon Defendants at the expense of the United States Government. d. Notwithstanding service of process by the United States Marshal's Service as directed herein, Plaintiff remains responsible for making sure that service is effected properly pursuant to the Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 8/11/2023. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail). (kby)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines: Summons due by 8/31/2023. (kby)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd W. Short. Motion referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (maf)
August 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Todd W. Short against Michael Boyd and John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Verification of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibits 1 - 10, #4 Exhibits 11 - 27, #5 Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons) (maf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Short v. Boyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd W. Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?