Barnes, et al v. United States Department of Interior, et al
Plaintiff: Don Barnes and James Bice
Defendant: United States Department of Interior, National Park Service, Great Smokey Mountains National Park and Cassius Cash
Case Number: 1:2024cv00134
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Amended CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: #1 Complaint by Don Barnes (McLean, Russell) Modified text on 5/7/2024 (kby).
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Attorney General of the United States National Park Service, Great Smokey Mountains National Park. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (cly)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Cassius Cash, Deb Haaland Secretary of the Interior National Capitol Park Headquarters. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (cly)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Interior, National Park Service, Great Smokey Mountains National Park, Cassius Cash (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6503524), filed by Don Barnes, *James Bice. (McLean, Russell) Modified to correct named parties case is filed against to list defendants and to add name of James Bice as an additional plaintiff filing this Complaint on 4/30/2024 (cly). (Main Document 1 replaced with .pdf of, only, Complaint, and Additional attachments #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 proposed Summonses added on 4/30/2024). NEF Regenerated (ejb).
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (cly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes, et al v. United States Department of Interior, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Barnes
Represented By: Russell L. McLean, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bice
Represented By: Russell L. McLean, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Park Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Smokey Mountains National Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassius Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?