American Rescue Workers, Inc. et al v. Glory Mountain Ministries et al
Plaintiff: American Rescue Workers, Inc. and American Rescue Workers
Defendant: Glory Mountain Ministries, Byron Martin, Shahrzad Martin, Alma Dyson, Paul E. Martin, Jr., Virginia Nottingham and Wanda M. Rawlings
Case Number: 1:2024cv00136
Filed: May 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2024 TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. All Defendants. Text of Order: ORDER: The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for Defendants to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is EXTENDED through and including July 25, 2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 6/10/2024. (kkb)
June 7, 2024 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by American Rescue Workers, Inc.. Wanda M. Rawlings served on 5/31/2024, answer due 6/21/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Cogburn, Clinton)
June 7, 2024 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by American Rescue Workers. Virginia Nottingham served on 5/30/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Cogburn, Clinton)
June 7, 2024 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by American Rescue Workers. Alma Dyson served on 5/30/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Cogburn, Clinton)
June 7, 2024 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by American Rescue Workers. Glory Mountain Ministries served on 5/30/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Cogburn, Clinton)
June 7, 2024 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by American Rescue Workers. Shahrzad Martin served on 5/30/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Cogburn, Clinton)
June 7, 2024 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by American Rescue Workers, Inc.Shahrzad Martin served on 5/30/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Cogburn, Clinton) Modified to correct docket text on 6/10/2024 (hms).
June 7, 2024 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glory Mountain Ministries. (Hogan, James) (Main Document 18 replaced to flatten pdf on 6/10/2024) (hms).
June 7, 2024 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Wanda M. Rawlings. (Hogan, James) (Main Document 17 replaced to flatten pdf on 6/10/2024) (hms).
June 7, 2024 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Virginia Nottingham. (Hogan, James) (Main Document 16 replaced to flatten pdf on 6/10/2024) (hms).
June 7, 2024 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Shahrzad Martin. (Hogan, James) (Main Document 15 replaced to flatten pdf on 6/10/2024) (hms).
June 7, 2024 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Paul E. Martin, Jr. (Hogan, James) (Main Document 14 replaced to flatten pdfon 6/10/2024) (hms).
June 7, 2024 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Glory Mountain Ministries. (Hogan, James) (Main Document 13 replaced to flatten pdf on 6/10/2024) (hms).
June 7, 2024 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Byron Martin. (Hogan, James) (Main Document 12 replaced to flatten pdf on 6/10/2024) (hms).
June 7, 2024 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Alma Dyson. (Hogan, James) (Main Document 11 replaced to flatten pdf on 6/10/2024) (hms).
June 6, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,, by Alma Dyson, Glory Mountain Ministries, Byron Martin, Paul E. Martin, Jr, Shahrzad Martin, Virginia Nottingham, Wanda M. Rawlings. (Hogan, James). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
May 7, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Alma Dyson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ejb)
May 6, 2024 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by American Rescue Workers. (Cogburn, Clinton)
May 6, 2024 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by American Rescue Workers, Inc.. (Cogburn, Clinton)
May 3, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Glory Mountain Ministries, Byron Martin, Paul E. Martin, Jr, Shahrzad Martin, Virginia Nottingham, Wanda M. Rawlings. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (cly)
May 3, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Durr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Durr, William)
May 3, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Rescue Workers. (Cogburn, Clinton) Modified Pltf's name on 5/3/2024. NEF Regenerated (ejb).
May 3, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Rescue Workers, Inc. (Cogburn, Clinton) Modified Pltf's name on 5/3/2024. NEF Regenerated (ejb).
May 3, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton H. Cogburn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cogburn, Clinton)
May 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Glory Mountain Ministries, Byron Martin, Shahrzad, Alma Dyson, Paul E. Martin, Jr., Virginia Nottingham, Wanda J. Rawlings with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6507916), filed by American Rescue Workers, Inc., American Rescue Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Special Warranty Deed, #2 Cover Sheet)(Cogburn, Clinton) (Attachment 2 .pdf replaced with flattened .pdf and Modified Pltfs' names on 5/3/2024.) NEF Regenerated (ejb). Modified All Defendants to individually named Defendants on 5/3/2024 (cly).
May 3, 2024 Case assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (cly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Rescue Workers, Inc. et al v. Glory Mountain Ministries et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Rescue Workers, Inc.
Represented By: Clinton H. Cogburn
Represented By: William S. Durr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Rescue Workers
Represented By: Clinton H. Cogburn
Represented By: William S. Durr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glory Mountain Ministries
Represented By: James B. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron Martin
Represented By: James B. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shahrzad Martin
Represented By: James B. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alma Dyson
Represented By: James B. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Martin, Jr.
Represented By: James B. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Nottingham
Represented By: James B. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda M. Rawlings
Represented By: James B. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?