Bhalla et al v. Nye et al
Plaintiff: Allison C. Bhalla and Varun K. Bhalla
Defendant: John E. Nye, IV, The Professionals Group, LLC doing business as Keller Williams Professionals doing business as Altamont Property Group, Bradley Cecil Pace, Joshua Eran Nye, Reese Morgani and Cynthia Thibault Nye
Case Number: 1:2024cv00145
Filed: May 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss by Cynthia Thibault Nye, John E. Nye, IV, Joshua Eran Nye. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
July 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Cynthia Thibault Nye, John E. Nye, IV, Joshua Eran Nye. Responses due by 7/17/2024 (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Joshua Eran Nye. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by John E. Nye, IV. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
June 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Cynthia Thibault Nye. (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting in part #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint. Cynthia Thibault Nye answer due 7/25/2024; John E. Nye, IV answer due 7/25/2024; Joshua Eran Nye answer due 7/25/2024. Text of Order: ORDER: As the initial 21-day period to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint does not appear to have expired, the Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED IN PART, and the deadline for Defendants John E. Nye, Joshua Eran Nye, and Cynthia Thibault Nye to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is EXTENDED through and including July 25, 2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 6/20/2024. (kkb)
June 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,, by Cynthia Thibault Nye, John E. Nye, IV, Joshua Eran Nye. (Fitzgerald, Andrew). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Fitzgerald on behalf of Cynthia Thibault Nye, John E. Nye, IV, Joshua Eran Nye (Fitzgerald, Andrew)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by The Professionals Group, LLC. (Dedman, James)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Reese Morgani. (Dedman, James)
June 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Bradley Cecil Pace. (Dedman, James)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to The Professionals Group, LLC served on 6/3/2024, answer due 6/24/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope from Buncombe County Sheriff's Office) (cly)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint . Reese Morgani answer due 7/15/2024; Bradley Cecil Pace answer due 7/15/2024. Text of Order: ORDER: Defendants Bradley Cecil Pace and Reese Morgani's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for Bradley Cecil Pace and Reese Morgani to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is EXTENDED through and including July 15, 2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 6/10/2024. (kkb)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint . The Professionals Group, LLC answer due 7/24/2024. Text of Order: ORDER: Defendant The Professionals Group, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED, and the deadline for The Professionals Group, LLC to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint is EXTENDED through and including July 24, 2024. So Ordered. Entered by US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 6/10/2024. (kkb)
June 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Professionals Group, LLC. (Dedman, James)
June 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Dedman, IV on behalf of Reese Morgani (Dedman, James)
June 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Dedman, IV on behalf of Bradley Cecil Pace (Dedman, James)
June 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,, by Reese Morgani, Bradley Cecil Pace. (Dedman, James). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Dedman, IV on behalf of The Professionals Group, LLC (Dedman, James)
June 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint,, by The Professionals Group, LLC. (Dedman, James). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Reese Morgani served on 5/23/2024; Bradley Cecil Pace served on 5/23/2024, answers due 6/13/2024. (Attachments: #1 Envelope from Buncombe County Sheriff's Office) (cly)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Allison C. Bhalla. (Contre, Eric)
May 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Varun K. Bhalla. (Contre, Eric)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Reese Morgani, Cynthia Thibault Nye, John E. Nye, IV, Joshua Eran Nye, Bradley Cecil Pace, The Professionals Group, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (cly)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John E. Nye, IV, Joshua Eran Nye, Cynthia Thibault Nye, The Professionals Group, LLC, Bradley Cecil Pace, Reese Morgani with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6520702), filed by Varun K Bhalla, Allison C. Bhalla. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Disclosures, #2 Exhibit Bhalla Deed)(Contre, Eric) Modified to add receipt number on 5/16/2024 (tlj). Modified against All Plaintiffs to individually named Defendants, and added additional filer of Complaint Allison C. Bhalla on 5/16/2024 (cly).
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and US Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (cly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bhalla et al v. Nye et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Nye, IV
Represented By: Andrew L. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Professionals Group, LLC doing business as Keller Williams Professionals doing business as Altamont Property Group
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Cecil Pace
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Eran Nye
Represented By: Andrew L. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reese Morgani
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Thibault Nye
Represented By: Andrew L. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison C. Bhalla
Represented By: Eric Andrew Contre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varun K. Bhalla
Represented By: Eric Andrew Contre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?