Brown v. Registrar of Deeds For Cleveland County et al
Plaintiff: Thurman Jerome Brown
Defendant: Martha R. Thompson, Sarah Jane Spikes, Cleveland County Magistrate, Registrar of Deeds, Murrell K. Spikes, Registrar of Deeds For Cleveland County, Rickey McCluney, Sarah Jane Kee Spikes, Destany McCluney, Mark D. Lackey, Thomas Martin and FNU LNU
Case Number: 1:2024cv00283
Filed: November 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: W Carleton Metcalf
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2025 Set Deadlines: Responses due by 1/22/2025 re: #5 AMENDED COMPLAINT and MOTION for Reconsideration. (hms)
December 9, 2024 Filing 5 Proposed AMENDED COMPLAINT and MOTION for Reconsideration re: #4 Order by Thurman Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (hms) Modified on 1/8/2025 (hms).
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs and the Plaintiff shall be allowed to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee or giving security therefor. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff's #1 Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Plaintiff shall have 30 days in which to amend his Complaint in accordance with the terms of this Order. If the Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint in accordance with this Order and within the time limit set by the Court, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice to the Plaintiff. (Amended Pleadings due by 12/27/2024.). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/25/2024. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (slm)
November 15, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thurman Jerome Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smm). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf.
November 15, 2024 Filing 2 Exhibits in support of #1 Complaint, by Thurman Jerome Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Exhibit L, #11 Envelope). Note: Exhibit C is attached to Exhibit A. (smm)
November 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cleveland County Magistrate, Mark D. Lackey, Thomas Martin, Destany McCluney, Rickey McCluney, Registrar of Deeds, Registrar of Deeds For Cleveland County, Murrell K. Spikes, Sarah Jane Spikes, Martha R. Thompson with Jury Demand, filed by Thurman Jerome Brown. (Attachments: #1 Class Action Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons-Not Filled Out, #3 Criminal Justice Background Check, #4 Copy of IFP first page in 1:24-cv-249, #5 Envelope)(smm)
November 15, 2024 Standing Order of Instructions Regarding Pro Se Litigants in Civil Actions. Click on this link to retrieve the #Standing Order (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (smm)
November 15, 2024 Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the #Standing Order (smm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Registrar of Deeds For Cleveland County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha R. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Jane Spikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland County Magistrate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Registrar of Deeds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murrell K. Spikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Registrar of Deeds For Cleveland County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickey McCluney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Jane Kee Spikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Destany McCluney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark D. Lackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LNU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurman Jerome Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?