Jackson County v. Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jackson County
Defendant: Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00045
Filed: August 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Jackson
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 28 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying as moot 30 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/14/2010. (pdf)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying as moot 7 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 7 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 11 Motion to Remand. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on November 3, 2009. (jhg)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the parties are hereby PROHIBITED from making any further filings in connection with the pending matters absent prior permission from the Court.. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on October 24, 2009. (pdf)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction set out in the Complaint is denied as moot, without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before fifteen (15) days from entry of this Order, the parties shall address the issues raised in this Order by written response not to exceed five pages. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/2/09. (jhg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson County v. Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson County
Represented By: David P. Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC
Represented By: Kiran H. Mehta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?