Gunkel et al v. Robbinsville Custom Molding, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Robert Gunkel and Kimberly Gunkel
Defendant: Robbinsville Custom Molding, Inc. and John Garland
Case Number: 2:2011cv00007
Filed: February 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 JUDGMENT in favor of Defts Robbinsville Custom Molding, Inc. and John Garland and against Pltfs Kimberly Gunkel and Robert Gunkel. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/10/13. (ejb)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that on or before November 19, 2012 the Plaintiffs shall file response addressing the evidence to show that the jurisdictional threshold of $75,000 has been satisfied. FURTHER ORDERED that on or before November 26, 2012, theDefendants shall file response to the Plaintiffs position. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/12/12. (emw)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER allowing to be withdrawn and dismissed 38 Motion to Quash and Motion for Protective Order; allowing 40 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery ( Discovery due by 9/6/2012.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/31/2012. (thh)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Joint Motion to Modify Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/30/11. (nll)
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Thomas H. Asselin for Robbinsville Custom Molding, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/30/11. (ejb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gunkel et al v. Robbinsville Custom Molding, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbinsville Custom Molding, Inc.
Represented By: James Whitelaw Middleton
Represented By: M. Charles Cloninger
Represented By: Thomas R. Bell, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas H. Asselin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Garland
Represented By: William Edward Cannon, Jr.
Represented By: M. Charles Cloninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Gunkel
Represented By: M. Charles Cloninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Gunkel
Represented By: M. Charles Cloninger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?