Regroup Development, LLC v. Rabun County Bank
Plaintiff: Regroup Development, LLC
Defendant: Rabun County Bank
Case Number: 2:2011cv00059
Filed: October 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Buncombe
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER: Dft's 93 Motion for Attorney Fees and Court Costs is GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. Other than Clerk's award of Court Costs in the Amt of $9,310.55, Dft's Motion is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/30/2014. (klb)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 91 JUDGMENT in favor of Rabun County Bank against Regroup Development, LLC, Regroup Sapphire 281, LLC. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/21/2013. (thh)
January 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER the administration of this case be removed from Asheville div. to Bryson City div. and the file number in this case be changed from Asheville div. to the appropriate file number for Bryson City div. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/10/12. (ejb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Regroup Development, LLC v. Rabun County Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabun County Bank
Represented By: Kenneth W. Fromknecht, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regroup Development, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Lacy Cash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?