Patterson v. Western Carolina University et al
Plaintiff: John E. Patterson
Defendant: University of North Carolina and Western Carolina University
Case Number: 2:2012cv00003
Filed: February 16, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/12/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 48 Pro Se Motion to Quash of Robert Ford. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/22/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying 38 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/16/13. (nll)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 33 Motion for Reconsideration. The Motion for Summary Judgment [# 31] is untimely as the Defendants failed to comply with the Court's prior Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/23/13. (emw)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss in Part and the Plaintiff's causes of action contained within (1) Count One for violations of Title VII, (2) Count Three for violations of the First Amendment, and (3) Count Four for a claim pursuant to N.C. Gen. Stat. §126-84 are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/14/13. (nll)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 20 Motion extend pre-trial deadlines. See Order for extended deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/19/12. (nll)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Western Carolina University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of North Carolina
Represented By: Katherine Adele Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Carolina University
Represented By: Katherine Adele Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Patterson
Represented By: Susan L. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?