Ratcliffe v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Pamela M. Ratcliffe
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Andrea Murphy
Case Number: 2:2012cv00051
Filed: August 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Andrea Murphy are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/10/2015. (klb)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Specifically, with respect to plf' ;s claim for negligent misrepresentation, the Motions to Dismiss [Docs. 8,11] are granted and this claim is dismissed. In all other respects, the Motions to dismiss [Docs. 8,11] are denied. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/30/2013. (cbb)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 25 & 26 Defts' Motions for Hearing or, in the alternative, Motions for Leave to File a response to Pltfs' supplemental authority. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/10/13. (ejb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratcliffe v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela M. Ratcliffe
Represented By: Edward Louis Bleynat, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?