Green v. Caterpillar Inc.
Plaintiff: Jerry Curtis Green
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv00026
Filed: June 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Macon
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2015 Filing 24 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 2/23/2015. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (nv)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER accepting the Magistrate Judge's #18 Memorandum and Recommendations; the Plaintiff's #21 Objections are accepted in part and rejected in part as explained; granting Defendant's #3 Motion to Dismiss, and this action is dismissed. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/23/2015. (nv) (Main Document 23 replaced on 2/25/2015) (emw).
October 30, 2014 Filing 22 REPLY to Objection to #18 Memorandum and Recommendations Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Objections to Report and Recommendation by Caterpillar Inc.. (Smith, Frederick)
October 17, 2014 Filing 21 OBJECTION to #18 Memorandum and Recommendations by Jerry Curtis Green. Replies due by 11/3/2014 (Howell, Andrew)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #19 Motion for Reconsideration re #17 Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/15/14. (ejb)
October 14, 2014 Filing 19 MOTION for Reconsideration by Jerry Curtis Green. Responses due by 10/31/2014 (Howell, Andrew). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS on #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Caterpillar Inc. Objections to M&R due by 10/17/2014; and ORDER that all further proceedings in this action including all discovery, are STAYED pending the District Judge's ruling on this Memorandum and Recommendation and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/30/14. (nv)
September 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Defendant's #10 Motion to Amend/Correct and denying Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 9/26/2014. (nv)
August 13, 2014 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Support re #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by Caterpillar Inc.. (Smith, Frederick)
August 8, 2014 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by Jerry Curtis Green. Replies due by 8/18/2014 (Howell, Andrew)
August 4, 2014 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Caterpillar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kary Kinsman)(Smith, Frederick)
August 1, 2014 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jerry Curtis Green. (Howell, Andrew)
July 24, 2014 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Jerry Curtis Green. Replies due by 8/4/2014 (Howell, Andrew)
July 22, 2014 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Caterpillar Inc.. Replies due by 8/1/2014 (Smith, Frederick)
July 22, 2014 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by Caterpillar Inc..Responses due by 8/8/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support Of Motion To Amend, #2 Exhibit A to MOL, #3 Exhibit Declaration)(Smith, Frederick). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court and #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Responses due by 7/24/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 07/21/2014. (thh)
July 21, 2014 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Jerry Curtis Green.Responses due by 8/7/2014 (Howell, Andrew). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Responses due by 7/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 07/08/2014. (thh)
July 8, 2014 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell no longer assigned to the case. Motions referred to David S. Cayer: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ; #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (jde)
July 7, 2014 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Jerry Curtis Green.Responses due by 7/24/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum Supporting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Appendix Appendix to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Appendix Exhibits Supporting Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Howell, Andrew)
July 7, 2014 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Jerry Curtis Green.Responses due by 7/24/2014 (Howell, Andrew). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
June 23, 2014 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caterpillar Inc. Case Assignment Packet (Smith, Frederick)
June 19, 2014 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Caterpillar Inc..Responses due by 7/7/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support)(Smith, Frederick). Motions referred to Dennis Howell.
June 19, 2014 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caterpillar Inc. (Smith, Frederick)
June 18, 2014 Notice to Attorney James U. Downs: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 6/30/2014. (ejb)
June 17, 2014 Case assigned to District Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ejb)
June 17, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court for Macon County, case number 14 CVS 162. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-2344015), filed by Caterpillar Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel)(Smith, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Caterpillar Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc.
Represented By: Frederick T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Curtis Green
Represented By: James U. Downs
Represented By: Andrew J. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?