Zepsa Industries, Inc. v. KIMBLE et al
Plaintiff: Zepsa Industries, Inc.
Defendant: ALVIN E KIMBLE, Richard Johnson and M/Y REBECCA
Case Number: 3:2008cv00004
Filed: January 3, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Presiding Judge: Carl Horn
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER allowing Amendment to Case Management Plan( Motions due by 4/15/2009.) All discovery in this case shall be complete no later than March 16,2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl Horn, III on 11/18/08. (dtr)
November 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re 39 Motion ; 48 Motion to Strike ; 48 Motion for clarification. The Court finds that the contracts at issue are maritime in nature and will be construed pursuant to North Carolina law. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 11/11/08. (dtr)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 62 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Douglas M. Muller for Alvin E. Kimble, Communications Consultants, Inc. and Telecommunication Consultants, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl Horn, III on 11/3/2008. (klg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zepsa Industries, Inc. v. KIMBLE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zepsa Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Martin L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVIN E KIMBLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/Y REBECCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?