Alexander v. Astrue et al
Plaintiff: Teresa Alexander
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue, Gretchen C.F. Shappert and Michael B. Mukasey
Case Number: 3:2008cv00178
Filed: April 21, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Carl Horn
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of plsintiff against defendant (dtr)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael J. Astrue, affirming 17 Memorandum and Recommendations, granting 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Teresa Alexander. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/21/08. (dtr)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending denying Defendant's 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael J. Astrue, recommending granting Plaintiff's 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Teresa Alexander Objections to M&R due by 11/20/2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl Horn, III on 10/31/2008. (klg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Astrue et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Alexander
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Byrnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen C.F. Shappert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Mukasey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?